EP4262765 - USE OF BACTERIORUBERINS AND GLYCOSYL DERIVATIVES THEREOF TO PREVENT AND TREAT DISEASES INVOLVING DYSREGULATED PROTEIN AGGREGATION, SUCH AS NEURODEGENERATIVE DISEASES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.09.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.06.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 21.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.02.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 27.03.2024 [2024/13] | 23.02.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 27.03.2024 [2024/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NAOS Institute of Life Science 355 Rue Pierre-Simon Laplace 13290 Aix-en-Provence / FR | For all designated states Thorel, Jean-Noël 3 Rue Larochelle 75014 Paris / FR | For all designated states Radman, Miroslav 54 bis, rue General Leclerc 94270 Le Kremlin Bicetre / FR | [2023/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THOREL, Jean-Noël 74014 PARIS / FR | 02 /
RADMAN, Miroslav 94270 LE KREMLIN BICETRE / FR | [2023/43] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Laurent & Charras Le Contemporain 50 Chemin de la Bruyère 69574 Dardilly Cedex / FR | [2023/43] | Application number, filing date | 21823624.8 | 16.12.2021 | [2023/43] | WO2021EP86302 | Priority number, date | FR20200013390 | 16.12.2020 Original published format: FR 2013390 | [2023/43] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022129407 | Date: | 23.06.2022 | Language: | FR | [2022/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4262765 | Date: | 25.10.2023 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.06.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/045, A61K31/202, A61P3/10, A61P9/10, A61P11/00, A61P25/28, A61P27/02 | [2023/43] | CPC: |
A61K31/202 (EP);
A61K31/045 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/43] | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON BACTERIORUBINEN UND GLYCOSYLDERIVATEN DAVON ZUR VORBEUGUNG UND BEHANDLUNG VON ERKRANKUNGEN MIT DYSREGULIERTER PROTEINAGGREGATION WIE NEURODEGENERATIVEN ERKRANKUNGEN | [2023/43] | English: | USE OF BACTERIORUBERINS AND GLYCOSYL DERIVATIVES THEREOF TO PREVENT AND TREAT DISEASES INVOLVING DYSREGULATED PROTEIN AGGREGATION, SUCH AS NEURODEGENERATIVE DISEASES | [2023/43] | French: | UTILISATION DES BACTÉRIORUBÉRINES ET LEURS DÉRIVÉS GLYCOSYLÉS POUR PRÉVENIR ET TRAITER LES MALADIES IMPLIQUANT UNE DÉRÉGULATION DE L'AGRÉGATION DES PROTÉINES, COMME LES MALADIES NEURODÉGÉNÉRATIVES | [2023/43] | Entry into regional phase | 15.06.2023 | National basic fee paid | 15.06.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.06.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/43] | 15.06.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2013337068 (PETYAEV IVAN [GB]) [X] 1,2,10,12,13 * par. 9, 42, 94, 101, 127 * [I] 3-9,11; | [XI] - RAM SHRISTI ET AL, "Bacteria as an alternate biofactory for carotenoid production: A review of its applications, opportunities and challenges", JOURNAL OF FUNCTIONAL FOODS, ELSEVIER BV, NL, vol. 67, doi:10.1016/J.JFF.2020.103867, ISSN 1756-4646, (20200304), (20200304), XP086126329 [X] 1,2,12,13 * p. 3, col. 2, par. 2; p. 7, col. 1, par. 3; p. 8, col. 1, par. 1 * [I] 3-11 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jff.2020.103867 | [A] - TATSUZAWA A H ET AL, "Quenching of singlet oxygen by carotenoids produced in Escherichia coli - attenuation of singlet oxygen-mediated bacterial killing by carotenoids", FEBS LETTERS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20001110), vol. 484, no. 3, doi:10.1016/S0014-5793(00)02149-9, ISSN 0014-5793, pages 280 - 284, XP004337755 [A] 1-13 * Abrégé; Tableau 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0014-5793(00)02149-9 | [A] - RUST P ET AL, "LONG-TERM ORAL BETA-CAROTENE SUPPLEMENTATION IN PATIENTS WITH CYSTIC FIBROSIS EFFECTS ON ANTIOXIDATIVE STATUS AND PULMONARY FUNCTION", ANNALS OF NUTRITION AND METABOLISM, KARGER, CH, (20000101), vol. 44, no. 1, ISSN 0373-0101, pages 30 - 37, XP008076663 [A] 1-13 * Abrégé * | [A] - RODRIGO-BAÑOS MONTSERRAT ET AL, "Carotenoids from Haloarchaea and Their Potential in Biotechnology", vol. 13, no. 9, doi:10.3390/md13095508, (20150101), pages 5508 - 5532, MARINE DRUGS, URL: http://rabida.uhu.es/dspace/bitstream/handle/10272/13533/Carotenoids%20from%20Haloarchaea.pdf?sequence=2, XP055816046 [A] 1-13 * p. 5519, par. 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3390/md13095508 | by applicant | WO2008038119 | FR3002544 | WO2014155189 | WO2014167247 | - CAS , no. 32719-43-0 | - ARMSTRONG GA, "Eubacteria show their true colors - genetics of carotenoid pigment biosynthesis from microbes to plants", J Bacteriol, (19940000), vol. 176, pages 4795 - 4802, XP002977725 | - "Genetics of eubacterial carotenoid biosynthesis: A colorful taie", ARMSTRONG, GA, Annu Rev Microbiol, Annual Reviews Inc., (19970000), pages 629 - 659 | - BRITTON G, "Structure and properties of carotenoids in relation to function", FASEB J, (19950000), vol. 9, pages 1551 - 1558 | - CALLIZOT NCOMBES MSTEINSCHNEIDER RPOINDRON P, "Operational dissection of l3-amyloid cytopathic effects on cultured neurons", J Neurosci Res, (20130000), vol. 91, pages 706 - 16 | - DUGGER BNDICKSON DW, "Pathology of Neurodegenerative Diseases", Cold Spring Harb Perspect Biol, (20170000), vol. 9, no. 7, page a028035 | - FARKHONDEH TSAMARGHANDIAN SSHATERZADEH YAZDI HSAMINI F, "The protective effects of crocin in the management of neurodegenerative diseases: a review", Am J Neurodegener Dis, (20180000), vol. 7, pages 1 - 10 | - FONG NBURGESS MBARROW KGLENN D, "Carotenoid accumulation in the psychrotrophic bacterium Arthrobacter agilis in response to thermal and sait stress", Appl Microbiol Biotechnol, (20010000), vol. 56, pages 750 - 756 | - MANDELLI FMIRANDA VSRODRIGUES EMERCADANTE AZ, "Identification of carotenoids with high antioxidant capacity produced by extremophile microorganisms. world", J Microbiol Biotechnol, (20120000), vol. 28, doi:10.1007/s11274-011-0993-y, pages 1781 - 1790, XP035037903 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11274-011-0993-y | - STRAND ASHIVAJI, SLIAAEN-JENSEN, "Bacterial carotenoids 55. C50-carotenoids 25: revised structures of carotenoids associated with membranes in psychrotrophic Micrococcus roseus", Bioch. Syst. & Eco., (19970000), vol. 25, no. 6, pages 547 - 552 |