EP4200758 - GRANULAR SIGNALS FOR OFFLINE-TO-ONLINE MODELING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.05.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.05.2023 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 21.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Google LLC 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2023/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DO, Loc Mountain View, California 94043 / US | [2023/26] | Representative(s) | Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road Holborn London WC1X 8NL / GB | [2023/26] | Application number, filing date | 21823698.2 | 09.11.2021 | [2023/26] | WO2021US58600 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023086074 | Date: | 19.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4200758 | Date: | 28.06.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.05.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G06N3/04, G06N3/08, G06Q30/02 | [2023/26] | CPC: |
G06N3/084 (EP);
G06F16/248 (US);
G06N3/09 (EP);
G06Q30/0201 (EP);
G06Q30/0202 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GRANULARE SIGNALE ZUR OFFLINE-ONLINE-MODELLIERUNG | [2023/26] | English: | GRANULAR SIGNALS FOR OFFLINE-TO-ONLINE MODELING | [2023/26] | French: | SIGNAUX GRANULAIRES POUR MODÉLISATION HORS LIGNE-EN LIGNE | [2023/26] | Entry into regional phase | 30.12.2022 | National basic fee paid | 30.12.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.12.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/26] | 30.12.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]US2019205939 (LAL RAGHAV [US], et al) [I] 1-22* paragraphs [0082] , [0083] , [0109]; figures 1,21A,21B * |