EP4259396 - USE OF NON-HALOGEN FIRE RETARDANT COMPOSITION FOR INDIRECT FIRE PROTECTION LAYERS ON SUBSTRATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.07.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.09.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.06.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 22.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | First examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ecochem International NV Industrielaan 25 2550 Olen / BE | For all designated states Fritz Egger GmbH & Co. OG Weiberndorf 20 6380 St. Johann in Tirol / AT | [2023/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WIEHN, Helmut 76831 Heuchelheim / DE | 02 /
DAESELEIRE, Pieter 2250 Olen / BE | 03 /
RIEPERTINGER, Manfred 83093 Bad Endorf / DE | 04 /
HERZOG, Andreas 6380 St. Johann in Tirol / AT | [2023/42] | Representative(s) | Brantsandpatents bv Pauline Van Pottelsberghelaan 24 9051 Ghent / BE | [2023/42] | Application number, filing date | 21823907.7 | 08.12.2021 | [2023/42] | WO2021EP84731 | Priority number, date | BE20200005898 | 09.12.2020 Original published format: BE 202005898 | EP20210151444 | 13.01.2021 Original published format: EP 21151444 | [2023/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022122797 | Date: | 16.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4259396 | Date: | 18.10.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.06.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B27K3/52, C09K21/04, C09K21/12 | [2023/42] | CPC: |
D21H17/51 (EP);
D21H23/46 (US);
B05D7/04 (EP);
B32B21/02 (US);
B32B21/06 (EP,US);
B32B21/14 (EP,US);
C09D161/28 (US);
C09D5/185 (US);
C09D7/61 (US);
C09D7/63 (US);
C09K21/06 (EP);
C09K21/12 (EP);
D21H11/04 (US);
D21H17/52 (EP);
D21H19/12 (US);
D21H19/40 (US);
D21H19/46 (US);
D21H19/62 (US);
D21H21/34 (EP);
D21H23/22 (US);
B05D1/02 (EP);
B05D1/12 (EP);
B05D1/18 (EP);
B05D2203/22 (EP);
B05D2252/02 (EP);
B05D2252/10 (EP);
B05D3/0254 (EP);
B05D7/24 (EP);
B32B2250/02 (US);
B32B2255/12 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/42] | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG EINER HALOGENFREIEN BRANDSCHUTZZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR INDIREKTE BRANDSCHUTZSCHICHTEN AUF SUBSTRATEN | [2023/42] | English: | USE OF NON-HALOGEN FIRE RETARDANT COMPOSITION FOR INDIRECT FIRE PROTECTION LAYERS ON SUBSTRATES | [2023/42] | French: | UTILISATION D'UNE COMPOSITION IGNIFUGE NON HALOGÉNÉE POUR DES COUCHES DE PROTECTION CONTRE LE FEU INDIRECTES SUR DES SUBSTRATS | [2023/42] | Entry into regional phase | 07.07.2023 | National basic fee paid | 07.07.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.07.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.07.2023 | Examination requested [2023/42] | 07.07.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.08.2023 | Observations by third parties | 22.12.2023 | Observations by third parties | 19.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.02.2024 | Observations by third parties | 17.07.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAI]US3934066 (MURCH ROBERT MATTHEWS); | [A]US2004266303 (JAFFEE ALAN MICHAEL [US]); | [A]US9669564 (ZHANG JUN [US], et al); | [AD]WO2018122406 (ECOCHEM INT NV [BE]); | [A]CN109370288 (GONGYI HONGSHENG RARE METAL CO LTD) | by applicant | DE4307406 | EP0767214 | WO9935196 | DE19814212 | DE19901525 | DE19946325 | US2004266303 | DE10361878 | US6989113 | US2012295996 | EP2586849 | US9669564 | WO2018122406 | other | CN102757754 | CN108659760 |