EP4243827 - METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING A KRASG12C INHIBITOR AND A PD-L1 BINDING ANTAGONIST FOR TREATING LUNG CANCER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.09.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.08.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.05.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 22.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Genentech, Inc. 1 DNA Way South San Francisco, CA 94080-4990 / US | [2023/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EVANGELISTA, Marie San Francisco, California 94080-4990 / US | 02 /
MERCHANT, Mark Andrew San Francisco, California 94080-4990 / US | 03 /
SCHUTZMAN, Jennifer Lee San Francisco, California 94080-4990 / US | 04 /
LIN, Ting-Kun Mark San Francisco, California 94080-4990 / US | 05 /
JOO, Stephanie Royer San Francisco, California 94080-4990 / US | 06 /
MANDLEKAR, Sandhya Vinayak San Francisco, California 94080-4990 / US | [2023/38] | Representative(s) | Jochnowitz, Evan F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | [2023/38] | Application number, filing date | 21824130.5 | 11.11.2021 | [2023/38] | WO2021US58874 | Priority number, date | US202063113606P | 13.11.2020 Original published format: US 202063113606 P | [2023/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022103904 | Date: | 19.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4243827 | Date: | 20.09.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.05.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/517, A61K39/395, A61P35/00, C07K16/32 | [2023/38] | CPC: |
A61K31/517 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K39/3955 (IL,US);
A61K39/39558 (EP,IL,KR);
A61K45/06 (KR);
A61K9/0019 (IL,US);
A61K9/0053 (IL,US);
A61P35/00 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07K16/2827 (EP,IL,KR);
A61K2039/505 (KR);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/517, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K39/39558, A61K2300/00 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/38] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT EINEM KRASG12C-HEMMER UND EINEM PD-L1-BINDENDEN ANTAGONISTEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON LUNGENKREBS | [2023/38] | English: | METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING A KRASG12C INHIBITOR AND A PD-L1 BINDING ANTAGONIST FOR TREATING LUNG CANCER | [2023/38] | French: | MÉTHODES ET COMPOSITIONS COMPRENANT UN INHIBITEUR DE KRASG12C ET UN ANTAGONISTE DE LIAISON PD-L1 POUR LE TRAITEMENT DU CANCER DU POUMON | [2023/38] | Entry into regional phase | 13.06.2023 | National basic fee paid | 13.06.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.06.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/38] | 13.06.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.09.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2020097537 (GENENTECH INC [US], et al); | [Y]WO2020106647 (AMGEN INC [US]); | by applicant | WO2007005874 | WO2010077634 | WO2011066389 | US8217149 | WO2012145493 | US2013034559 | WO2013181634 | US9205148 | WO2016000619 | US2016108123 | WO2016061142 |