EP4244768 - AUTOMATIC EARLY-EXITING MACHINE LEARNING MODELS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.08.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.05.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 22.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 21.02.2024 [2024/08] | 19.01.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 21.02.2024 [2024/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM INCORPORATED ATTN: International IP Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2023/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EHTESHAMI BEJNORDI, Babak San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
HABIBIAN, Amirhossein San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 03 /
PORIKLI, Fatih Murat San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 04 /
GHODRATI, Amir San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2023/38] | Representative(s) | Klang, Alexander H. Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [2023/38] | Application number, filing date | 21824190.9 | 16.11.2021 | [2023/38] | WO2021US59536 | Priority number, date | US202063114434P | 16.11.2020 Original published format: US 202063114434 P | US202117527076 | 15.11.2021 Original published format: US202117527076 | [2023/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022104271 | Date: | 19.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4244768 | Date: | 20.09.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.05.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06N3/04, G06N3/08 | [2023/38] | CPC: |
G06N3/084 (EP,KR);
G06V10/82 (EP,KR,US);
G06V10/764 (EP,KR,US);
G06N3/045 (EP,KR,US);
G06N3/0464 (KR,US);
G06V10/809 (EP,KR);
G06V10/811 (KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/38] | Title | German: | AUTOMATISCHE FRÜH AUSLAUFENDE MASCHINENLERNMODELLE | [2023/38] | English: | AUTOMATIC EARLY-EXITING MACHINE LEARNING MODELS | [2023/38] | French: | MODÈLES D'APPRENTISSAGE MACHINE À SORTIE PRÉCOCE AUTOMATIQUE | [2023/38] | Entry into regional phase | 13.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 13.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/38] | 13.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]CN111445026 (UNIV SOUTHEAST); |