EP4324157 - METHOD, METER, AND SYSTEM FOR DATA AUDIT TRAIL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.01.2024 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.10.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 24.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | 20.06.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Landis+Gyr AG Alte Steinhauserstrasse 18 6330 Cham / CH | [2024/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAAS, Jürg 6343 Rotkreuz / CH | [2024/08] | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [2024/08] | Application number, filing date | 21824344.2 | 01.12.2021 | [2024/08] | WO2021EP83823 | Priority number, date | CH20210000401 | 16.04.2021 Original published format: CH 4012021 | [2024/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022218563 | Date: | 20.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4324157 | Date: | 21.02.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.10.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/32, G06Q30/04, G06Q50/06 | [2024/08] | CPC: |
H04L9/3247 (EP,CH,US);
G01D4/004 (CH,US);
H04L9/30 (US);
H04L9/3236 (US);
H04L9/3297 (CH,US);
H04L9/50 (EP);
H04L2209/60 (CH)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/08] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, MESSGERÄT UND SYSTEM FÜR DATENPRÜFVERFOLGUNG | [2024/08] | English: | METHOD, METER, AND SYSTEM FOR DATA AUDIT TRAIL | [2024/08] | French: | PROCÉDÉ, COMPTEUR, ET SYSTÈME DE VÉRIFICATION RÉTROSPECTIVE DE DONNÉES | [2024/08] | Entry into regional phase | 16.10.2023 | National basic fee paid | 16.10.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.10.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.10.2023 | Examination requested [2024/08] | 16.10.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]WO2017049309 (EORIGINAL INC [US]); |