EP4259361 - POWDER MANUFACTURING FOR POWDER METALLURGY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.09.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.06.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 24.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] | 09.02.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Danmarks Tekniske Universitet Anker Engelunds Vej 101 2800 Kongens Lyngby / DK | For all designated states Nordic Metals ApS Industrivej 25-27 3300 Frederiksvaerk / DK | [2023/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NADIMPALLI, Venkata Karthik 2800 Kongens Lyngby / DK | 02 /
PEDERSEN, David Bue 2800 Kongens Lyngby / DK | 03 /
SØRENSEN, Jan 3300 Frederiksværk / DK | 04 /
THEMSEN, Jesper Bjørklund 3300 Frederiksværk / DK | [2023/42] | Representative(s) | Høiberg P/S Adelgade 12 1304 Copenhagen K / DK | [2023/42] | Application number, filing date | 21824579.3 | 08.12.2021 | [2023/42] | WO2021EP84763 | Priority number, date | EP20200212533 | 08.12.2020 Original published format: EP 20212533 | [2023/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022122809 | Date: | 16.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4259361 | Date: | 18.10.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.06.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B22F9/00, B22F9/10, B22D23/00, C22C1/04 | [2023/42] | CPC: |
B22F9/10 (EP);
B22F9/082 (EP,US);
B22D23/003 (EP);
B22F1/05 (US);
B22F1/052 (EP);
B33Y70/00 (EP);
B33Y80/00 (US);
C22C1/04 (EP);
B22F2009/001 (EP);
B22F2009/0888 (EP);
B22F2203/11 (US);
B22F2203/13 (US);
B22F2304/10 (US);
B22F2998/10 (US);
B22F2999/00 (EP);
Y02P10/25 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
B22F2999/00, B22F2009/084, B22F9/082, B22F9/10 (EP);
B22F2999/00, B22F9/082, B22F9/04, B22F8/00 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/42] | Title | German: | PULVERHERSTELLUNG FÜR PULVERMETALLURGIE | [2023/42] | English: | POWDER MANUFACTURING FOR POWDER METALLURGY | [2023/42] | French: | FABRICATION DE POUDRE POUR MÉTALLURGIE DES POUDRES | [2023/42] | Entry into regional phase | 26.06.2023 | National basic fee paid | 26.06.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.06.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/42] | 26.06.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH10216921 (HOWMET RES CORP) [A] 1-20* claims 1-22 *; | [A]US6302939 (RABIN BARRY H [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * claims 1-7 *; | [XI]CN107812954 (SHENZHEN NONFEMET TECH CO LTD) [X] 14 * example 1 * * claims 1-10 * [I] 1-13,19,20; | [A]US2018214956 (LAROUCHE FRÉDÉRIC [CA], et al) [A] 19 * paragraph [0038] *; | [X]US2019217394 (ZAKOTNIK MIHA [US], et al) [X] 15,16 * paragraph [0005] *; | [X]US2020140979 (VALLS ANGLÉS ISAAC [ES]) [X] 17,18 * paragraph [0501] * |