EP4237116 - PURIFICATION PLATFORMS FOR OBTAINING PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS HAVING A REDUCED HYDROLYTIC ENZYME ACTIVITY RATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.08.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.05.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 24.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 07.02.2024 [2024/06] | 05.01.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 07.02.2024 [2024/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Genentech, Inc. 1 DNA Way South San Francisco, CA 94080-4990 / US | [2023/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEAY, Alex San Francisco, California 94080-4990 / US | 02 /
WONG, Marc San Francisco, California 94080-4990 / US | 03 /
WOON, Stephen San Francisco, California 94080-4990 / US | 04 /
LEE, Michael San Francisco, California 94080-4990 / US | 05 /
KHOO, Stefanie San Francisco, California 94080-4990 / US | 06 /
O'DWYER, William San Francisco, California 94080-4990 / US | 07 /
DUENAS, Eileen, T. San Francisco, California 94080-4990 / US | 08 /
YIGZAW, Yinges San Francisco, California 94080-4990 / US | 09 /
LIM, Amy San Francisco, California 94080-4990 / US | [2023/36] | Representative(s) | Beyermann, Jochen Carl F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG CLP - Patent Department Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | [2023/36] | Application number, filing date | 21824706.2 | 28.10.2021 | [2023/36] | WO2021US57100 | Priority number, date | US202063108194P | 30.10.2020 Original published format: US 202063108194 P | [2023/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022094116 | Date: | 05.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4237116 | Date: | 06.09.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.05.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B01D15/36, B01D15/38, C07K1/16, C07K1/34, C07K16/00, B01D15/32, B01D15/18 | [2023/36] | CPC: |
B01D15/361 (EP,IL);
B01D15/3847 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07K1/36 (EP,IL,KR,US);
B01D15/1871 (EP,IL,KR);
B01D15/327 (EP,IL,KR,US);
B01D15/362 (IL,KR,US);
B01D15/363 (IL,KR,US);
B01D15/3809 (IL,KR,US);
B01D15/424 (IL,KR,US);
B01D39/1615 (IL,KR,US);
B01D39/1623 (IL,KR,US);
B01D39/18 (IL,KR,US);
B01D39/2068 (IL,KR,US);
B01D61/145 (IL,KR,US);
B01D61/16 (IL,KR,US);
C07K1/18 (IL,KR,US);
C07K1/34 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07K16/00 (EP,IL,KR,US);
B01D2239/0414 (IL,KR,US);
B01D2311/04 (IL,KR,US);
B01D2311/2623 (IL,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/36] | Title | German: | REINIGUNGSPLATTFORMEN ZUR HERSTELLUNG PHARMAZEUTISCHER ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT REDUZIERTER HYDROLYTISCHER ENZYMAKTIVITÄT | [2023/36] | English: | PURIFICATION PLATFORMS FOR OBTAINING PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS HAVING A REDUCED HYDROLYTIC ENZYME ACTIVITY RATE | [2023/36] | French: | PLATEFORMES DE PURIFICATION POUR OBTENIR DES COMPOSITIONS PHARMACEUTIQUES AYANT UN TAUX D'ACTIVITÉ D'HYDROLYSE ENZYMATIQUE RÉDUIT | [2023/36] | Entry into regional phase | 30.05.2023 | National basic fee paid | 30.05.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.05.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.05.2023 | Examination requested [2023/36] | 30.05.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2010048192 (ABBOTT LAB [US], et al); | [XI]WO2013028330 (EMD MILLIPORE CORP [US], et al); | [X]WO2013177115 (ABBVIE INC [US]); | [XYI]WO2018170488 (GILEAD SCIENCES INC [US]); | [XY]WO2019191416 (BRISTOL MYERS SQUIBB CO [US]); | [XI]WO2020006266 (ALEXION PHARMA INC [US]); | [A]WO2020023566 (MERCK SHARP & DOHME [US], et al); | [XY]WO2020200980 (RICHTER GEDEON NYRT [HU]); | [XP]WO2020227144 (GENENTECH INC [US], et al) | by applicant | US4816567 | EP0404097 | WO9311161 | US2014309403 | WO2018035025 | WO2020US31164 |