EP4169530 - STABLE FORMULATION FOR RECOMBINANT ANTI-PD-1 MONOCLONAL ANTIBODY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.03.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.06.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sinocelltech Ltd. No.31 Kechuang 7th St, BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | [2023/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HU, Ping Beijing 100176 / CN | 02 /
LIU, Yan Beijing 100176 / CN | 03 /
SUN, Chunyun Beijing 100176 / CN | 04 /
HUAI, Qingru Beijing 100176 / CN | 05 /
TIAN, Shaomei Beijing 100176 / CN | 06 /
TAO, Mingzhen Beijing 100176 / CN | [2023/17] | Representative(s) | Dolphin, Kirsty Mairi, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2023/17] | Application number, filing date | 21825363.1 | 17.06.2021 | [2023/17] | WO2021CN100658 | Priority number, date | CN202010566153 | 19.06.2020 Original published format: CN202010566153 | [2023/17] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021254447 | Date: | 23.12.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4169530 | Date: | 26.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 23.12.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.06.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/395, C07K16/28, A61P35/00 | [2023/17] | CPC: |
A61P35/00 (EP,KR);
A61K39/39591 (EP,KR);
C07K16/2896 (US);
A61K47/02 (EP,KR);
A61K47/12 (KR);
A61K47/183 (EP,KR);
A61K47/22 (KR);
A61K47/26 (EP,KR);
A61K9/08 (KR);
A61K9/19 (US);
C07K16/28 (KR);
C07K16/2818 (EP);
A61K2039/505 (KR,US);
C07K2317/565 (US);
C07K2317/76 (EP);
C07K2317/92 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/17] | Title | German: | STABILE FORMULIERUNG FÜR REKOMBINANTEN MONOKLONALEN ANTI-PD-1-ANTIKÖRPER | [2023/17] | English: | STABLE FORMULATION FOR RECOMBINANT ANTI-PD-1 MONOCLONAL ANTIBODY | [2023/17] | French: | FORMULATION STABLE POUR ANTICORPS MONOCLONAL ANTI-PD-1 RECOMBINANT | [2023/17] | Entry into regional phase | 06.01.2023 | Translation filed | 06.01.2023 | National basic fee paid | 06.01.2023 | Search fee paid | 06.01.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.01.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]CN106390115 (SHANGHAI JUNSHI BIOSCIENCES CO LTD, et al); | [A]WO2020015703 (CHIA TAI TIANQING PHARMACEUTICAL GROUP CO LTD [CN]); | [XI]CN110787292 (SHANGHAI HENLIUS BIOTECH INC); |