EP4151935 - REFRIGERATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.02.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2023/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SON, Jonghyun Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Byoungmok Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 03 /
PARK, Taecheol Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 04 /
LEE, Jeonghyun Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2023/12] | Representative(s) | Walaski, Jan Filip Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2023/12] | Application number, filing date | 21825681.6 | 23.04.2021 | [2023/12] | WO2021KR05143 | Priority number, date | KR20200075013 | 19.06.2020 Original published format: KR 20200075013 | KR20200161449 | 26.11.2020 Original published format: KR 20200161449 | [2023/12] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021256698 | Date: | 23.12.2021 | Language: | KO | [2021/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4151935 | Date: | 22.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 23.12.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.09.2023 | Classification | IPC: | F25D23/02, F25D29/00 | [2023/12] | CPC: |
F25D23/028 (EP,KR,US);
F25D23/025 (EP,US);
E05D11/0054 (EP,US);
E05D11/0081 (EP,US);
E05D7/081 (EP);
F25D23/063 (US);
F25D29/005 (KR);
E05Y2201/64 (EP);
E05Y2400/324 (EP);
E05Y2400/445 (US);
E05Y2900/31 (EP,US);
F25D2323/023 (KR);
F25D2323/024 (EP,KR);
F25D2400/18 (KR);
F25D2400/40 (EP,KR);
F25D2700/02 (EP,KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/12] | Title | German: | KÜHLSCHRANK | [2023/12] | English: | REFRIGERATOR | [2023/12] | French: | RÉFRIGÉRATEUR | [2023/12] | Entry into regional phase | 15.12.2022 | Translation filed | 15.12.2022 | National basic fee paid | 15.12.2022 | Search fee paid | 15.12.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.12.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/12] | 15.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS56174678U (N.N.) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [XAYI]KR20110138772 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [X] 1-4 * figures 3,6,7 * [A] 9,10,15 [Y] 7,8 [I] 5,6,12-14; | [A]US2018187952 (LV PING [CN], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [YA]US2019017742 (POST RYAN M [US], et al) [Y] 7,8 * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0041]; figures 2,9,10 * [A] 1 | International search | [A]US2010154457 (KIM DONG-JEONG [KR], et al) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0033]-[0057] and figures 3-13. *; | [Y]KR20100085247 (DAEWOO ELECTRONICS CORP [KR]) [Y] 7-10,12-15 * See paragraphs [0023]-[0024] and [0030] and figure 3. *; | [YA]KR20110138772 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [Y] 1-10,12-15 * See paragraphs [0016], [0039] and [0042], claim 1 and figures 1, 3 and 5. * [A] 11; | [Y]KR20180013178 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 1-10,12-15 * See paragraphs [0069]-[0071] and [0114] and figure 3. *; | [A]EP3040661 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-15* See paragraphs [0057]-[0095] and figures 3-5. * |