EP4165621 - LINEAR ACTUATOR SYSTEM FOR MOTION SIMULATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.03.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states D-Box Technologies Inc. 2172 rue de la Province Longueuil, Québec J4G 1R7 / CA | [2023/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GAGNON, Stephan Laval, Québec H7L 5K3 / CA | [2023/16] | Representative(s) | Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [2023/16] | Application number, filing date | 21825884.6 | 15.06.2021 | [2023/16] | WO2021CA50814 | Priority number, date | US202063039078P | 15.06.2020 Original published format: US 202063039078 P | US202163165319P | 24.03.2021 Original published format: US 202163165319 P | [2023/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021253117 | Date: | 23.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4165621 | Date: | 19.04.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 23.12.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G09B9/00, A63G31/02, G09B9/12 | [2023/49] | CPC: |
G09B9/12 (EP);
H02K41/02 (US);
A63G31/02 (EP);
A63G31/16 (EP);
A63J25/00 (EP);
A63J5/00 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2023/16] | G09B9/00, A47C1/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/16] | Title | German: | LINEARAKTUATORSYSTEM FÜR EINEN BEWEGUNGSSIMULATOR | [2023/16] | English: | LINEAR ACTUATOR SYSTEM FOR MOTION SIMULATOR | [2023/16] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ACTIONNEUR LINÉAIRE POUR SIMULATEUR DE MOUVEMENT | [2023/16] | Entry into regional phase | 09.01.2023 | National basic fee paid | 09.01.2023 | Search fee paid | 09.01.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.01.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/16] | 24.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US9829149 (JENNINGS CLIFFORD ALLEN [US]) | International search | [A]JPH0667599 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD); | [X]KR101955688B ; | [X]KR102039158B ; | [X]WO2020091134 (INNOSIMULATION CO LTD [KR]) | by applicant | US6585515 | US7934773 | US9829149 | KR101955688B | KR102039158B | WO2020091134 | WO2013US72605 |