EP4168186 - SCREENING PANEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.03.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.06.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schenck Process Australia Pty Limited Ground Floor 65 Epping Road North Ryde, New South Wales 2113 / AU | [N/P] |
Former [2023/17] | For all designated states Schenck Process Australia Pty Ltd. Ground Floor 65 Epping Road North Ryde, New South Wales 2113 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOHNSTONE, Aidan Paul Ryde, New South Wales 2113 / AU | [2023/17] | Representative(s) | Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. Postfach 70 04 25 81304 München / DE | [2023/17] | Application number, filing date | 21825943.0 | 16.06.2021 | [2023/17] | WO2021AU50623 | Priority number, date | AU20200902012 | 17.06.2020 Original published format: AU 2020902012 | [2023/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021253084 | Date: | 23.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4168186 | Date: | 26.04.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 23.12.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.2024 | Classification | IPC: | B07B1/46, B07B1/04 | [2023/17] | CPC: |
B07B1/4645 (EP,AU,US);
B07B1/46 (AU);
B07B2201/02 (EP,AU,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/17] | Title | German: | SIEBPLATTE | [2023/17] | English: | SCREENING PANEL | [2023/17] | French: | PANNEAU DE CRIBLAGE | [2023/17] | Entry into regional phase | 11.01.2023 | National basic fee paid | 11.01.2023 | Search fee paid | 11.01.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.01.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/17] | 19.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE929047 (EISEN & STAHLIND AG); | [YA]DE2754374 (KUEPER GUMMI); | [XYI]US4661245 (RUTHERFORD WILLIAM [AU], et al); | [A]CA2269314 (NIXON NEVILLE P [CA]) | International search | [X]US4265742 (BUECKER FRITZ O, et al); | [X]US4762610 (FREISSLE MANFRED F A [ZA]); | [X]US4892767 (FREISSLE MANFRED F A [DE]); | [X]WO2006031176 (METSO MINERALS WEAR PROT AB [SE], et al); | [X]WO2015106305 (SCHENCK PROCESS AUSTRALIA PTY LTD [AU]) |