EP4167859 - METHODS FOR ASSESSING BRAIN HEALTH USING BEHAVIOURAL AND/OR ELECTROPHYSIOLOGICAL MEASURES OF VISUAL PROCESSING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.03.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | 05.07.2024 | Change - classification | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | 05.07.2024 | Change - classification | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Baycrest Centre for Geriatric Care 3560 Bathurst Street Toronto, Ontario M6A 2E1 / CA | [2023/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEKULER, Allison York, Ontario M6A 2E1 / CA | 02 /
ROUDAIA, Eugenie York, Ontario M6A 2E1 / CA | 03 /
HASHEMI, Ali York, Ontario M6A 2E1 / CA | [2023/17] | Representative(s) | Penza, Giancarlo Bugnion S.p.A. Viale Lancetti, 17 20158 Milano / IT | [2023/17] | Application number, filing date | 21826228.5 | 21.06.2021 | [2023/17] | WO2021CA50847 | Priority number, date | US202063041666P | 19.06.2020 Original published format: US 202063041666 P | [2023/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021253139 | Date: | 23.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4167859 | Date: | 26.04.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 23.12.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/378, A61B5/16, A61B5/369, A61B5/377 | [2023/17] | CPC: |
A61B5/4088 (EP);
G16H50/20 (US);
A61B5/165 (EP,US);
A61B5/378 (EP);
A61B5/7264 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/17] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEURTEILUNG DER GEHIRNGESUNDHEIT UNTER VERWENDUNG VON VERHALTENS- UND/ODER ELEKTROPHYSIOLOGISCHEN MESSUNGEN DER VISUELLEN VERARBEITUNG | [2023/17] | English: | METHODS FOR ASSESSING BRAIN HEALTH USING BEHAVIOURAL AND/OR ELECTROPHYSIOLOGICAL MEASURES OF VISUAL PROCESSING | [2023/17] | French: | PROCÉDÉS D'ÉVALUATION DE LA SANTÉ CÉRÉBRALE À L'AIDE DE MESURES COMPORTEMENTALES ET/OU ÉLECTROPHYSIOLOGIQUES DU TRAITEMENT VISUEL | [2023/17] | Entry into regional phase | 18.01.2023 | National basic fee paid | 18.01.2023 | Search fee paid | 18.01.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.01.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.04.2022 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: CA | 18.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/17] | 10.08.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2003013981 (GEVINS ALAN [US], et al); | [X]US2009318825 (KILBORN KERRY [GB]); | International search | [X]EP2037807 (DIAGNOSTIC POTENTIALS LTD [GB]); | [X]CA2950906 (CERORA INC [US], et al); | [X]EP3471600 (KING DEVICK TEST INC [US]); | [X]US10478114 (SANO YUKO [JP], et al) |