EP4168190 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR ASSEMBLING WIND TURBINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.03.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VESTAS WIND SYSTEMS A/S Hedeager 42 8200 Aarhus N / DK | [2023/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NIELSEN, Ben Møller 8200 Aarhus N / DK | [2023/17] | Representative(s) | Vestas Patents Department Hedeager 42 8200 Aarhus N / DK | [2023/17] | Application number, filing date | 21826903.3 | 09.06.2021 | [2023/17] | WO2021DK50181 | Priority number, date | EP20200180973 | 19.06.2020 Original published format: EP 20180973 | [2023/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021254572 | Date: | 23.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4168190 | Date: | 26.04.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | XN | 23.12.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.2024 | Classification | IPC: | B21D1/08, F03D13/10, F03D13/20, F03D13/40 | [2024/30] | CPC: |
F03D13/20 (EP,US);
F03D13/10 (US);
B21D1/08 (US);
F03D13/112 (EP);
F03D13/402 (EP);
F05B2260/30 (EP);
F16B13/063 (EP);
F16B2200/506 (EP);
Y02E10/72 (EP);
Y02E10/728 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/17] | B21D1/08, F03D13/10, F03D13/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/17] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR MONTAGE EINER WINDTURBINE | [2023/17] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR ASSEMBLING WIND TURBINE | [2023/17] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ D'ASSEMBLAGE D'ÉOLIENNE | [2023/17] | Entry into regional phase | 03.01.2023 | National basic fee paid | 03.01.2023 | Search fee paid | 03.01.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.01.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US5593261 (GIANNUZZI ANTHONY C [US], et al); | [A]EP2538000 (VESTAS WIND SYS AS [DK]); | [XYI]EP2650447 (CLAXTON ENGINEERING SERVICES LTD [GB]); | [A]US2015308134 (BJOERNSKOV SOEREN LINDE [DK], et al); | [A]CN108087205 (JIANGSU JINFENG SCIENCE & TECH CO LTD); | [IY]CN110671278 (TONGJI ARCH DESIGN GROUP CO LTD); | [XI]WO2020035770 (SIEMENS GAMESA RENEWABLE ENERGY B V [NL]) | International search | [A]EP2538000 (VESTAS WIND SYS AS [DK]); | [A]WO2015161854 (VESTAS WIND SYS AS [DK]); | [A]EP2998570 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [AD]EP3179099 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) |