EP4337352 - GAME CONTROLLER MOBILE BRIDGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.02.2024 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.04.2023 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 28.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GOOGLE LLC 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View CA 94043 / US | [2024/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MCDOLE, John, Thomas Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | 02 /
JOSEPH, Matt Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2024/12] | Representative(s) | Maikowski & Ninnemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 15 09 20 10671 Berlin / DE | [2024/12] | Application number, filing date | 21827467.8 | 19.11.2021 | [2024/12] | WO2021US60051 | Priority number, date | US202163246419P | 21.09.2021 Original published format: US 202163246419 P | [2024/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023048744 | Date: | 30.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4337352 | Date: | 20.03.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.03.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.03.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A63F13/352, A63F13/355, A63F13/22, A63F13/23, A63F13/42 | [2024/12] | CPC: |
A63F13/352 (EP,US);
A63F13/22 (EP);
A63F13/23 (EP,US);
A63F13/355 (EP,US);
A63F13/42 (EP);
A63F13/92 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MOBILE BRÜCKE FÜR SPIELSTEUERUNG | [2024/12] | English: | GAME CONTROLLER MOBILE BRIDGE | [2024/12] | French: | PASSERELLE MOBILE POUR MANETTE DE JEU | [2024/12] | Entry into regional phase | 15.12.2023 | National basic fee paid | 15.12.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.12.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.12.2023 | Examination requested [2024/12] | 15.12.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2014179424 (PERRY DAVID [US], et al); | [XI]WO2019194953 (GOOGLE LLC [US]); | [A]WO2021021341 (SONY INTERACTIVE ENTERTAINMENT INC [JP], et al) |