Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP4251318
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
26.07.2024 |
Change - applicant |
published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] |
16.04.2024 |
New entry: Decision on request for further processing |
|
08.04.2024 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
08.04.2024 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
06.04.2024 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
07.02.2024 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
05.02.2024 |
New entry: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
02.02.2024 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 06.03.2024 [2024/10] |
02.02.2024 |
Change - extension states |
published on 06.03.2024 [2024/10] |
02.10.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.09.2023 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 04.10.2023 [2023/40] |
01.09.2023 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
01.09.2023 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 04.10.2023 [2023/40] |
07.08.2023 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.06.2023 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
24.05.2023 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.05.2023 |
Change - representative |
|
23.05.2023 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.07.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.06.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.06.2022 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|
31.12.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|