EP4251318 - CATALYST AND PROCESS USING SSZ-91 AND ZSM-12 [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.09.2023 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.06.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 31.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | Change - applicant | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chevron U.S.A. Inc. 5001 Executive Parkway San Ramon, CA 94583 / US | [2024/35] |
Former [2023/40] | For all designated states Chevron U.S.A. Inc. 6001 Bollinger Canyon Road P.O. Box 6006 San Ramon, California 94583-0806 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Yihua San Ramon, California 94583-0806 / US | 02 /
OJO, Adeola Florence San Ramon, California 94583-0806 / US | 03 /
LEI, Guan-Dao San Ramon, California 94583-0806 / US | [2023/40] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP One Portwall Square Portwall Lane Bristol BS1 6BH / GB | [2023/40] | Application number, filing date | 21827725.9 | 22.11.2021 | [2023/40] | WO2021US60313 | Priority number, date | US202017105614 | 26.11.2020 Original published format: US202017105614 | [2023/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2022115371 | Date: | 02.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/22] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4251318 | Date: | 04.10.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.06.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B01J23/42, B01J29/74, B01J29/80, C07C5/27 | [2023/40] | CPC: |
B01J23/42 (EP,KR);
B01J37/0201 (KR,US);
C10G45/64 (EP,KR,US);
B01J29/74 (EP,KR);
B01J29/7446 (EP,KR);
B01J29/7461 (EP,KR,US);
B01J29/7469 (EP,KR,US);
B01J29/80 (EP,KR,US);
B01J37/04 (KR,US);
B01J37/088 (KR,US);
C10M109/02 (KR,US);
C10M177/00 (KR,US);
B01J2029/062 (KR,US);
C10G2300/202 (KR,US);
C10G2300/301 (KR,US);
C10G2300/302 (KR,US);
C10G2300/304 (EP,KR,US);
C10G2300/308 (KR,US);
C10G2300/4006 (KR,US);
C10G2300/4012 (KR,US);
C10G2300/4018 (KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/40] | Title | German: | KATALYSATOR UND VERFAHREN UNTER VERWENDUNG VON SSZ-91 UND ZSM-12 | [2023/40] | English: | CATALYST AND PROCESS USING SSZ-91 AND ZSM-12 | [2023/40] | French: | CATALYSEUR ET PROCÉDÉ UTILISANT SSZ-91 ET ZSM-12 | [2023/40] | Entry into regional phase | 23.05.2023 | National basic fee paid | 23.05.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.05.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.05.2023 | Examination requested [2023/40] | 23.05.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.02.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 06.02.2024 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 05.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Request for further processing for: | 05.04.2024 | Request for further processing filed | 05.04.2024 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.04.2024 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2011124940 (BURTON JR ALLEN W [US]) [Y] 1-18 * paragraphs [0078] , [0079] , [0083] - [0091] *; | [Y]US2017058209 (OJO ADEOLA FLORENCE [US], et al) [Y] 1-18 * paragraphs [0055] , [0056] , [0071] , [0072] , [0069] *; | [Y]US2017335216 (HOMMELTOFT SVEN IVAR [US]) [Y] 1-18* paragraphs [0081] , [0082] * | by applicant | US3832449 | US3852207 | US4391785 | US4673487 | US5135638 | US5282958 | US5558851 | US6790433 | US7282134 | US8101811 | US8679451 | WO2017034823 | US9802830 | US9802831 | US9920260 | US10618816 | - Chem. Eng. News, (19850000), vol. 63, no. 5, pages 26 - 27 |