EP4251283 - METHODS AND COMPOSITION FOR TREATMENT OF IMMUNE-MEDIATED DISEASES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.09.2023 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.06.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 31.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 06.03.2024 [2024/10] | 02.02.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 06.03.2024 [2024/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Nanotherapeutics LLC 566 Latimer Rd. Santa Monica, CA 90402 / US | [2023/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HORWITZ, David A Santa Monica, California 90402 / US | [2023/40] | Representative(s) | Secerna LLP The Old Fire Station 18 Clifford Street York YO1 9RD / GB | [2023/40] | Application number, filing date | 21827765.5 | 23.11.2021 | [2023/40] | WO2021US60612 | Priority number, date | US202063118863P | 27.11.2020 Original published format: US 202063118863 P | [2023/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022115474 | Date: | 02.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4251283 | Date: | 04.10.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.06.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61P37/02, A61K38/18, A61K38/20, A61K47/69, C07K16/28 | [2023/40] | CPC: |
C07K16/2806 (EP);
A61K39/4621 (US);
A61K38/1729 (US);
A61K38/1841 (EP,US);
A61K38/2013 (EP,US);
A61K39/46434 (US);
A61K47/6849 (EP);
A61K47/6937 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/06 (US);
C07K16/2809 (EP);
C07K16/2812 (EP);
C07K16/2818 (EP);
A61K2039/505 (EP);
A61K2039/5154 (US);
A61K2039/577 (US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K38/1841, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K38/2013, A61K2300/00 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/40] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON IMMUNVERMITTELTEN ERKRANKUNGEN | [2023/40] | English: | METHODS AND COMPOSITION FOR TREATMENT OF IMMUNE-MEDIATED DISEASES | [2023/40] | French: | MÉTHODES ET COMPOSITIONS POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE MALADIES MÉDIÉES PAR L'IMMUNITÉ | [2023/40] | Entry into regional phase | 12.06.2023 | National basic fee paid | 12.06.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.06.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/40] | 12.06.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [IY]WO2013173076 (UNIV SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA [US], et al) [I] 7,9,14,27-29 * example 1; claims 26-27 * [Y] 7,9,14,27-29; | [XDYI] - HORWITZ DAVID A. ET AL, "Suppression of Murine Lupus by CD4+ and CD8+ Treg Cells Induced by T Cell-Targeted Nanoparticles Loaded With Interleukin-2 and Transforming Growth Factor [beta]", ARTHRITIS & RHEUMATOLOGY, US, vol. 71, no. 4, doi:10.1002/art.40773, ISSN 2326-5191, (20190305), pages 632 - 640, URL: https://onlinelibrary.wiley.com/doi/full-xml/10.1002/art.40773, XP055895617 [XD] 1-6,8,10-12,15-25,30,31,37 * the whole document * [Y] 7,9,14,27-29 [I] 13,28,32-36,38 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/art.40773 | [A] - GRAY J D ET AL, "Generation of an inhibitory circuit involving CD8+ T cells, IL-2, and NK cell-derived TGF-beta: contrasting effects of anti-CD2 and anti-CD3", THE JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, WILLIAMS & WILKINS CO, US, (19980301), vol. 160, no. 5, ISSN 0022-1767, pages 2248 - 2254, XP002099413 [A] 1-38 | [A] - DENIZ GUNNUR ET AL, "Regulatory NK Cells Suppress Antigen-Specific T Cell Responses", THE JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, US, vol. 180, no. 2, doi:10.4049/jimmunol.180.2.850, ISSN 0022-1767, (20080115), pages 850 - 857, URL: https://www.jimmunol.org/content/jimmunol/180/2/850.full.pdf, XP055898316 [A] 1-38 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4049/jimmunol.180.2.850 | [A] - GRAY J D ET AL, "THE ROLE OF TRANSFORMING GROWTH FACTOR BETA IN THE GENERATION OF SUPPRESSION: AN INTERACTION BETWEEN CD8+ T AND NK CELLS", JOURNAL OF EXPERIMENTAL MEDICINE, ROCKEFELLER UNIVERSITY PRESS, US, (19941101), vol. 180, no. 5, doi:10.1084/JEM.180.5.1937, ISSN 0022-1007, pages 1937 - 1942, XP000961145 [A] 1-38 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1084/jem.180.5.1937 | [A] - ZHENG SONG GUO ET AL, "CD4 + and CD8 + Regulatory T Cells Generated Ex Vivo with IL-2 and TGF-[beta] Suppress a Stimulatory Graft-versus-Host Disease with a Lupus-Like Syndrome", THE JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, US, vol. 172, no. 3, doi:10.4049/jimmunol.172.3.1531, ISSN 0022-1767, (20040201), pages 1531 - 1539, URL: https://www.jimmunol.org/content/jimmunol/172/3/1531.full.pdf, XP055895677 [A] 1-38 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4049/jimmunol.172.3.1531 | [AD] - ZUMRUT HASAN E ET AL, "Ligand-guided selection of aptamers against T-cell Receptor-cluster of differentiation 3 (TCR-CD3) expressed on Jurkat.E6 cells", ANALYTICAL BIOCHEMISTRY, ACADEMIC PRESS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20160809), vol. 512, doi:10.1016/J.AB.2016.08.007, ISSN 0003-2697, pages 1 - 7, XP029711380 [AD] 13,14 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ab.2016.08.007 | [A] - TAKAHASHI MAYUMI ET AL, "High throughput sequencing analysis of RNA libraries reveals the influences of initial library and PCR methods on SELEX efficiency", SCIENTIFIC REPORTS, vol. 6, no. 1, doi:10.1038/srep33697, (20160901), URL: http://www.nature.com/articles/srep33697, XP055777216 [A] 13 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/srep33697 | [XP] - HORWITZ DAVID A. ET AL, "Anti-CD2 Antibody-Coated Nanoparticles Containing IL-2 Induce NK Cells That Protect Lupus Mice via a TGF-[beta]-Dependent Mechanism", FRONTIERS IN IMMUNOLOGY, (20201216), vol. 11, doi:10.3389/fimmu.2020.583338, XP055895719 [XP] 1-6,8,10-12,15-25,30,31,37 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3389/fimmu.2020.583338 | by applicant | GB929406 | GB929401 | US3266987 | US3610795 | US4460563 | US4794000 | US4816567 | US5624821 | WO9958572 | US6194551 | WO2009046446 | - "Overview of the pathogenesis of systemic lupus erythematosus", FERRETTI AND LA CAVA, Systemic lupus erythematosus. Basic, applied and clinical aspects, Academic Press, (20160000), pages 55 - 62 | - WONG et al., Drugs Today (Barc, (20110000), vol. 47, pages 289 - 302 | - BURT et al., JAMA, (20060000), vol. 295, pages 527 - 35 | - GITELMAN et al., J Autoimmun, (20160000), vol. 71, pages 78 - 87 | - HUNTER et al., ACS Nano, (20140000), vol. 25, pages 2148 - 60 | - MALDONADO et al., Proc Natl Acad Sci USA, (20150000), vol. 112, pages 156 - 65 | - LOOK et al., J Clin Invest, (20130000), vol. 123, pages 1741 - 9 | - OTOMO et al., J Immunol, (20150000), vol. 195, pages 5533 - 7 | - MAEDA et al., J Clin Invest, (20180000), vol. 128, pages 3445 - 59 | - CLEMENTE-CASARES et al., Nature, (20160000), vol. 530, pages 434 - 40 | - LAN et al., J Mol Cell Biol, (20120000), vol. 4, pages 409 - 19 | - PARK et al., Mol Pharm, (20110000), vol. 8, pages 143 - 52 | - SAKAGUCHI S et al., lmmunol Rev, (20060000), vol. 212, pages 8 - 27 | - Proc Natl Acad Sci USA., (20080219), vol. 105, no. 7, pages 2586 - 2591 | - MORRISON et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19840000), vol. 81, pages 6851 - 6855 | - ANGAL et al., Mol. Immunol., (19930000), vol. 30, pages 105 - 08 | - HOLLINGER et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. U.S.A., (19930000), vol. 90, pages 6444 - 48 | - GRUBER et al., J. Immunol., (19940000), vol. 152, page 5368 | - YU B et al., Mol Membr Biol., (20100000), vol. 27, no. 7, pages 286 - 98 | - ZUMRUT HE et al., Ann Biochem, (20160000), vol. 512, pages 1 - 7 | - CHEN W et al., J Exp Med, (20030000), vol. 198, pages 1875 - 86 | - SPANGLER JB et al., J Immunol, (20180000), vol. 201, pages 2094 - 2106 | - WAN YFLAVELL R., Immunol. Rev., (20070000), vol. 220, pages 199 - 213 | - "NCBI", Database accession no. NG_016779.1 | - MORTARA L. et al., Front. Immunol., (20180000), vol. 9, page 2905 | - ARENAS-RAMIREZ N et al., Trends Immunol., (20150000), vol. 36, no. 12, pages 763 - 777 | - "GenBank", Database accession no. S77834.1 | - MALDONADO RA et al., Proc Nat Acad Sci, (20150000), vol. 112, pages 156 - 65 | - Datta SK Ann NY Acad Sci, (20030000), vol. 987, pages 79 - 90 | - HAHN BH, Arthritis Rheum, (20010000), vol. 44, pages 438 - 441 | - ROEP BO et al., Lancet, (20190000), vol. 7, pages 65 - 74 | - SELSTED ME et al., Nature Immunol, (20050000), vol. 6, pages 552 - 557 | - SYKES M, Transplantation, (20170000), vol. 101, pages 274 - 83 | - KOSIEWICZ MMALARD P, Immunologic Res., (20060000), vol. 30, pages 155 - 70 | - TONGAONKER P et al., Physical Genomics, (20190000), vol. 51, pages 657 - 67 | - OCHANDO et al., J Immunol, (20050000), vol. 174, pages 3247 - 7005 | - HAFLER et al., J Immunol, (19880000), vol. 141, pages 131 - 8 | - RIGBY et al., J Clin Invest, (20150000), vol. 125, pages 3285 - 96 | - MCHUGH et al., Biomaterials, (20150000), vol. 59, pages 172 - 81 | - HORWITZ, DA et al., Arthritis Rheumatol, (20190000), vol. 71, pages 632 - 640 | - DINESH et al., Autoimmun Rev, (20100000), vol. 9, pages 560 - 8 | - LA CAVAET et al., J Immunol, (20040000), vol. 173, pages 3542 - 8 | - LOURENGO et al., Proc Natl Acad Sci USA, (20160000), vol. 113, pages 10637 - 42 | - FERRERA et al., Arthritis Rheum, (20070000), vol. 56, pages 1945 - 53 | - VIA et al., Immunol Today, (19880000), vol. 9, pages 207 - 13 | - RUS et al., J Immunol, (19950000), vol. 155, pages 2396 - 406 | - SINGH et al., J Immunol, (20070000), vol. 178, pages 7649 - 57 | - SHARABI et al., J Immunol, (20080000), vol. 181, pages 3243 - 51 | - SCALAPINO et al., PLoS One, (20090000), vol. 24, page e6031 | - SUZUKI et al., J Immunol, (20120000), vol. 189, pages 2118 - 30 | - ZHANG et al., J Immunol, (20090000), vol. 183, pages 6346 - 58 | - HIROKAWA et al., J Exp Med, (19940000), vol. 180, page 1937 | - HORWITZ et al., Clin Immunol, (20130000), vol. 149, pages 450 - 63 | - LABOWSKY et al., Nanomedicine, (20150000), vol. 11, no. 1, pages 019 - 28 | - LABOWSKY et al., Chem Eng Sci, (20120000), vol. 74, pages 114 - 123 | - STEENBLOCK et al., J Biol Chem, (20110000), vol. 286, pages 34883 - 92 | - OHTSUTKAHORWITZ, J Immunol, (19980000), vol. 160, pages 2539 - 45 | - ZHENG SG et al., International Immunol, (20060000), vol. 18, pages 279 - 89 | - RASOOL R, Int. J. Organ Transplantation Med, (20150000), vol. 6, pages 8 - 13 | US19630631188 |