EP4255584 - COMPOSITIONS FOR KERATIN FIBERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.07.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.04.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.09.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.06.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 31.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MK
MT
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
RS
SE
SI
SK
SM
TR
L'OREAL 14 rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | [2023/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Isaac Eng Ting Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 2130012 / JP | 02 /
SHIBUYA, Yoshiki Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 2130012 / JP | 03 /
TSAO, Yi-Yun Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 2130012 / JP | [2024/18] |
Former [2023/41] | 01 /
LEE, Isaac Eng Ting Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 2130012 / JP | ||
02 /
SHIBUYA, Yoshiki Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 2130012 / JP | |||
03 /
TSAO, Yi-Yun Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 2130012 / JP | Representative(s) | Lavoix Bayerstraße 83 80335 München / DE | [2023/41] | Application number, filing date | 21827821.6 | 30.11.2021 | [2023/41] | WO2021JP44600 | Priority number, date | JP20200199434 | 01.12.2020 Original published format: JP 2020199434 | FR20210000339 | 14.01.2021 Original published format: FR 2100339 | [2023/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022118979 | Date: | 09.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4255584 | Date: | 11.10.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.06.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4255584 | Date: | 21.08.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61Q5/12, A61K8/85, A61K8/898 | [2023/41] | CPC: |
A61K8/85 (EP,US);
A61K8/898 (EP,US);
A61Q5/12 (EP,US);
A61K2800/594 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN FÜR KERATINFASERN | [2023/41] | English: | COMPOSITIONS FOR KERATIN FIBERS | [2023/41] | French: | COMPOSITION POUR FIBRES DE KÉRATINE | [2023/41] | Entry into regional phase | 26.05.2023 | National basic fee paid | 26.05.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.05.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.05.2023 | Examination requested [2023/41] | 26.05.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.07.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 17.07.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.07.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2006124352 (CRODA JAPAN KK); | [AD]JP4754326B ; | [A]WO2012072765 (OREAL [FR], et al); | [A]FR2984149 (OREAL [FR]); | [A]FR3045375 (OREAL [FR]); | by applicant | US4137180 | US4185087 | EP0186507 | US4874554 | US4957732 | EP0530974 | EP0750848 | JP2003226609 | JP2004256515 | JP2005179377 | JP4754326B | FR19850016334 | FR20030002809 |