EP4173902 - BATTERY TRANSMISSION SYSTEM AND BATTERY SWAP STATION THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.03.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 31.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nio Technology (Anhui) Co., Ltd Building F Hengchuang Intelligent Science and Technology Park No. 3963 Susong Road Economic and Technological Development Zone Hefei City, Anhui 230601 / CN | [2023/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Yongjie Shanghai 201804 / CN | 02 /
YANG, Chao Shanghai 201804 / CN | 03 /
ZHANG, Ning Shanghai 201804 / CN | 04 /
CAO, Jia Shanghai 201804 / CN | 05 /
ZHANG, Xiang Shanghai 201804 / CN | 06 /
XIA, Lijian Shanghai 201804 / CN | [2023/18] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstraße 3 81675 München / DE | [2023/18] | Application number, filing date | 21828346.3 | 21.05.2021 | [2023/18] | WO2021CN95204 | Priority number, date | CN202010595233 | 24.06.2020 Original published format: CN202010595233 | [2023/18] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021258946 | Date: | 30.12.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4173902 | Date: | 03.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 30.12.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B60S5/06, B60L53/80 | [2023/18] | CPC: |
B60L53/80 (EP,CN,US);
B60K1/04 (EP,US);
B60L50/64 (US);
B60L50/66 (US);
B60L53/35 (EP);
B65G47/52 (CN);
H01M50/244 (US);
H01M50/256 (US);
B60K2001/0455 (EP,US);
B60K2001/0472 (EP);
B60L2200/26 (US);
B60S5/06 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/18] | Title | German: | BATTERIEÜBERTRAGUNGSSYSTEM UND BATTERIEWECHSELSTATION DAFÜR | [2023/18] | English: | BATTERY TRANSMISSION SYSTEM AND BATTERY SWAP STATION THEREFOR | [2023/18] | French: | SYSTÈME DE TRANSMISSION DE BATTERIE ET STATION DE PERMUTATION DE BATTERIE ASSOCIÉE | [2023/18] | Entry into regional phase | 18.01.2023 | Translation filed | 18.01.2023 | National basic fee paid | 18.01.2023 | Search fee paid | 18.01.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.01.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/18] | 22.12.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.01.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.05.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]CN102139680 (ZICONG XIE); | [XI]CN102202944 (BETTER PLACE GMBH) | International search | [X]CN102202944 (BETTER PLACE GMBH); | [A]CN105000001 (ELECTRIC POWER RES INST OF STATE GRID SHANDONG ELECTRIC POWER CO, et al); | [X]CN108216150 (HUNAN INST TECH); | [A]JP2018154190 (MITSUBISHI MOTORS CORP); | [X]CN110745110 (NANJING YINGHE VALLEY TECH CO LTD); | [A]CN210437163U (NINGBO JIANG CHEN AUTOMATION EQUIPMENT CO LTD); | [PX]CN111674286 (WUHAN NIO ENERGY CO LTD); | [PX]CN212667171U (WUHAN NIO ENERGY CO LTD) |