EP4152624 - RADIO-FREQUENCY PA MID DEVICE, RADIO-FREQUENCY SYSTEM AND COMMUNICATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.02.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 31.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP., LTD. No. 18, Haibin Road Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2023/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FENG, Bin Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2023/12] | Representative(s) | Taor, Simon Edward William, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2023/12] | Application number, filing date | 21828479.2 | 30.04.2021 | [2023/12] | WO2021CN91414 | Priority number, date | CN202010582296 | 23.06.2020 Original published format: CN202010582296 | [2023/12] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021258855 | Date: | 30.12.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4152624 | Date: | 22.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 30.12.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/40, H04B1/44 | [2023/45] | CPC: |
H04B1/44 (EP);
H04B1/40 (CN);
H04B1/0078 (US);
H04B1/0057 (US);
H04B1/0458 (CN,US);
H04B1/18 (CN);
H04B2001/0408 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/12] | H04B1/40 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/12] | Title | German: | HOCHFREQUENZ-PA-MITTELVORRICHTUNG, HOCHFREQUENZSYSTEM UND KOMMUNIKATIONSVORRICHTUNG | [2023/12] | English: | RADIO-FREQUENCY PA MID DEVICE, RADIO-FREQUENCY SYSTEM AND COMMUNICATION DEVICE | [2023/12] | French: | DISPOSITIF PA MOYENNES FRÉQUENCES, SYSTÈME RADIOFRÉQUENCE ET DISPOSITIF DE COMMUNICATION | [2023/12] | Entry into regional phase | 12.12.2022 | Translation filed | 12.12.2022 | National basic fee paid | 12.12.2022 | Search fee paid | 12.12.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.12.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/12] | 03.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP3148263 (INTEL IP CORP [US]) [A] 1* figures 2,4,5 *; | [XAYI]US2017257135 (SOLOMKO VALENTYN [DE], et al) [X] 1,8,9 * paragraph [0054] * * figure 13 * [A] 11-15 [Y] 2-7 [I] 10; | [Y]WO2020019124 (GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP LTD [CN]) [Y] 2-7 * figures 3A-3E * | International search | [A]CN105375946 (SKYWORKS SOLUTIONS INC) [A] 1-16 * entire document *; | [A]US2018331715 (XU SHUMING [US]) [A] 1-16* entire document *; | [A]US2019123769 (PEHLKE DAVID RICHARD [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * entire document *; | [A]CN110708089 (GUANGZHOU HUIZHI MICROELECTRONICS CO LTD) [A] 1-16 * entire document *; | [A]CN110768634 (GUANGZHOU HUIZHI MICROELECTRONICS CO LTD) [A] 1-16 * description, paragraphs [0043]-[0097], and figures 1-17 *; | [A] - Sprint Corporation, "Band 41 HPUE feasibility measurements using APT mode", 3GPP Draft; R4-158075, 3rd Generation Partnership Project (3GPP), Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France, Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France , (20151116), vol. RAN WG4, no. Anaheim, US; 20151116 - 20151120, XP051040804 [A] 1-16 * entire document * |