EP4154657 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR UE ASSISTANCE INFORMATION REPORT FOR SIDELINK DRX IN A WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.02.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 31.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2023/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JEONG, Kyeongin Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 02 /
SI, Hongbo Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2023/13] | Representative(s) | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2023/13] | Application number, filing date | 21828877.7 | 22.06.2021 | [2023/13] | WO2021KR07838 | Priority number, date | US202063042198P | 22.06.2020 Original published format: US 202063042198 P | US202063087639P | 05.10.2020 Original published format: US 202063087639 P | US202117350927 | 17.06.2021 Original published format: US202117350927 | [2023/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021261893 | Date: | 30.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4154657 | Date: | 29.03.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.12.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 30.12.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.11.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04W24/10, H04W76/28, // H04W24/02, H04W76/14 | [2023/49] | CPC: |
H04W76/28 (EP,KR,US);
H04W72/25 (KR);
H04W24/10 (EP,KR,US);
H04W92/10 (KR);
H04W92/18 (KR);
H04W24/02 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2023/13] | H04W72/12, H04W72/04, H04W76/28, H04W76/14, H04W92/18, H04W92/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/13] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG FÜR UE-HILFSINFORMATIONSBERICHT FÜR SIDELINK-DRX IN EINEM DRAHTLOSKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2023/13] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR UE ASSISTANCE INFORMATION REPORT FOR SIDELINK DRX IN A WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | [2023/13] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE RAPPORT D'INFORMATIONS D'ASSISTANCE D'UE POUR UNE DRX DE LIAISON LATÉRALE DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL | [2023/13] | Entry into regional phase | 22.12.2022 | National basic fee paid | 22.12.2022 | Search fee paid | 22.12.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.12.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/13] | 09.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.04.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP3500028 (SONY CORP [JP]); | International search | [A]WO2018016882 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | [A]WO2018064477 (INTEL IP CORP [US]); | [A]US2019174411 (XU XIAODONG [CN], et al); | [A]EP3499975 (ZTE CORP [CN]); |