EP4173822 - MULTI-LAYER FILM, AND MULTI-LAYER STRUCTURE IN WHICH SAME IS USED [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.03.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 31.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.06.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kuraray Co., Ltd. 1621, Sakazu Kurashiki-shi, Okayama 710-0801 / JP | [2023/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KITAMURA, Masahiro B9120 Melsele / BE | 02 /
YOSHIDA, Kentaro Kurashiki-shi, Okayama 713-8550 / JP | 03 /
LUYTEN, Wout B9120 Melsele / BE | [2023/18] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2023/18] | Application number, filing date | 21829021.1 | 24.06.2021 | [2023/18] | WO2021JP23968 | Priority number, date | JP20200109761 | 25.06.2020 Original published format: JP 2020109761 | [2023/18] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021261560 | Date: | 30.12.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4173822 | Date: | 03.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.12.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.06.2024 | Classification | IPC: | B32B27/28, B32B27/30, B32B27/32, B65D65/40, C08J5/18, B32B7/023, B32B7/027, B32B7/035 | [2024/28] | CPC: |
B32B7/02 (EP,US);
B32B7/12 (EP,US);
B32B27/08 (EP,US);
B32B27/306 (EP,US);
B32B27/32 (EP,US);
B32B7/023 (EP);
B32B7/027 (EP);
B32B7/035 (EP);
B65D65/40 (US);
B32B2250/02 (EP);
B32B2250/03 (EP);
B32B2250/24 (EP,US);
B32B2250/246 (EP);
B32B2255/10 (EP,US);
B32B2255/20 (US);
B32B2255/205 (EP);
B32B2264/00 (EP);
B32B2264/10 (EP);
B32B2264/102 (EP);
B32B2264/105 (EP);
B32B2264/12 (EP);
B32B2270/00 (EP);
B32B2272/00 (EP);
B32B2307/30 (EP);
B32B2307/40 (EP);
B32B2307/414 (EP,US);
B32B2307/514 (EP);
B32B2307/516 (EP,US);
B32B2307/518 (EP,US);
B32B2307/704 (EP);
B32B2307/7244 (EP,US);
B32B2307/7376 (EP,US);
B32B2439/70 (EP);
B32B2553/00 (EP,US);
B65D2565/385 (US);
B65D2565/387 (US);
Y02W30/80 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/18] | B32B27/28, B32B27/30, B32B27/32, B65D65/40 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/18] | Title | German: | MEHRSCHICHTFOLIE UND MEHRSCHICHTIGE STRUKTUR DAMIT | [2023/18] | English: | MULTI-LAYER FILM, AND MULTI-LAYER STRUCTURE IN WHICH SAME IS USED | [2023/18] | French: | FILM MULTICOUCHE ET STRUCTURE MULTICOUCHE DANS LAQUELLE CELUI-CI EST UTILISÉ | [2023/18] | Entry into regional phase | 30.12.2022 | Translation filed | 05.01.2023 | National basic fee paid | 05.01.2023 | Search fee paid | 05.01.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.01.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]JP2000318095 (KURARAY CO); | [XI]WO2013187455 (KURARAY CO [JP]); | [A]US9951199 (NONAKA YASUHIRO [JP], et al); | [I]EP2554372 (KURARAY CO [JP]); | [I]WO2020071513 (KURARAY CO [JP]); | [E]WO2021210606 (KURARAY CO [JP]) | International search | [A]JPH081876 (SUMITOMO BAKELITE CO); | [A]JPH0986562 (KUREHA CHEMICAL IND CO LTD); | [A]JPH10501196 ; | [A]JP2000318095 (KURARAY CO); | [A]JP2006312313 (NIPPON SYNTHETIC CHEM IND); | [A]JP2011051264 (KURARAY CO); | [A]JP2013049736 (NIPPON SYNTHETIC CHEM IND); | [A]JP2014531341 ; | [A]WO2015182681 (NIPPON SYNTHETIC CHEM IND [JP]); | [A]WO2018225698 (KURARAY CO [JP]) | by applicant | WO2020071513 |