EP4170989 - MESSAGE PROCESSING METHOD AND DEVICE, AND COMPUTER READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.05.2024 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.03.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 31.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2023/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XU, Lin Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2023/17] | Representative(s) | Zoli, Filippo Brunacci & Partners S.r.l. Via Pietro Giardini, 625 41125 Modena / IT | [2023/17] | Application number, filing date | 21829502.0 | 16.06.2021 | [2023/17] | WO2021CN100406 | Priority number, date | CN202010581645 | 23.06.2020 Original published format: CN202010581645 | [2023/17] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021259111 | Date: | 30.12.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4170989 | Date: | 26.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 30.12.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.09.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04L45/00, H04L101/668 | [2023/42] | CPC: |
H04L61/5061 (EP,CN);
H04L61/5007 (EP,CN);
H04L45/54 (EP);
H04L45/745 (EP,CN);
H04L2101/659 (EP);
H04L2101/668 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2023/17] | H04L29/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/17] | Title | German: | NACHRICHTENVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG SOWIE COMPUTERLESBARES SPEICHERMEDIUM | [2023/17] | English: | MESSAGE PROCESSING METHOD AND DEVICE, AND COMPUTER READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM | [2023/17] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT DE MESSAGE, ET SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT LISIBLE PAR ORDINATEUR | [2023/17] | Entry into regional phase | 17.01.2023 | Translation filed | 17.01.2023 | National basic fee paid | 17.01.2023 | Search fee paid | 17.01.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.01.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/17] | 05.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.03.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.09.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2016142321 (GAGE WILLIAM ANTHONY [CA]); | [I]US2019238497 (TOURRILHES JEAN [US], et al) |