EP4156028 - MULTITASK LEARNING METHOD AND DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.02.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 31.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2023/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KONG, Chuili Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
ZHANG, Gongzheng Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
LI, Rong Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2023/13] | Representative(s) | Körber, Martin Hans Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/13] | Körber, Martin Hans Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstraße 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 21829643.2 | 23.06.2021 | [2023/13] | WO2021CN101723 | Priority number, date | CN202010588363 | 24.06.2020 Original published format: CN202010588363 | [2023/13] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021259305 | Date: | 30.12.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4156028 | Date: | 29.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 30.12.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.10.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G06N3/0455, G06N3/096, G06N3/084 | [2023/47] | CPC: |
G06N3/096 (EP);
G06N3/045 (CN);
G06N3/0455 (EP);
G06N3/08 (CN);
G06N3/084 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2023/13] | G06N3/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/13] | Title | German: | MULTITASK-LERNVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG | [2023/13] | English: | MULTITASK LEARNING METHOD AND DEVICE | [2023/13] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF D'APPRENTISSAGE MULTITÂCHES | [2023/13] | Entry into regional phase | 21.12.2022 | Translation filed | 21.12.2022 | National basic fee paid | 21.12.2022 | Search fee paid | 21.12.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.12.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/13] | 18.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.03.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI] - SHIVA PENTYALA ET AL, "Multi-Task Networks With Universe, Group, and Task Feature Learning", ARXIV.ORG, CORNELL UNIVERSITY LIBRARY, 201 OLIN LIBRARY CORNELL UNIVERSITY ITHACA, NY 14853, (20190703), XP081389001 [X] 1-4,7,10-13,15 * the whole document * [I] 5,6,8,9,14 | [XI] - XIPENG QIU ET AL, "Multi-Criteria Chinese Word Segmentation with Transformer", ARXIV.ORG, CORNELL UNIVERSITY LIBRARY, 201 OLIN LIBRARY CORNELL UNIVERSITY ITHACA, NY 14853, (20190628), XP081385380 [X] 1-4,7,10-13,15 * the whole document * [I] 5,6,8,9,14 | [A] - BEHNAM GHOLAMI ET AL, "Unsupervised Multi-Target Domain Adaptation: An Information Theoretic Approach", ARXIV.ORG, CORNELL UNIVERSITY LIBRARY, 201 OLIN LIBRARY CORNELL UNIVERSITY ITHACA, NY 14853, (20181027), XP080928447 [A] 5,6,8,9,14 * the whole document * | [A] - PAUL MICHEL ET AL, "Are Sixteen Heads Really Better than One?", ARXIV.ORG, CORNELL UNIVERSITY LIBRARY, 201 OLIN LIBRARY CORNELL UNIVERSITY ITHACA, NY 14853, (20190525), XP081387598 [A] 5,6,8,9,14 * the whole document * |