EP4248116 - HIGH PRESSURE DIRECT PILOT ACTUATED VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.08.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.05.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 04.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 21.02.2024 [2024/08] | 19.01.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 21.02.2024 [2024/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tescom Corporation 12616 Industrial Blvd. Elk River, MN 55330 / US | [2023/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RENOLLETT, Jacob, T., R. Andover, MN 55304 / US | 02 /
UNGUREANU, Bogdan, G. Wayne, NJ 07470 / US | [2023/39] | Representative(s) | Foot, Paul Matthew James Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [2023/39] | Application number, filing date | 21830551.4 | 17.11.2021 | [2023/39] | WO2021US59745 | Priority number, date | US202063115601P | 18.11.2020 Original published format: US 202063115601 P | [2023/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022109041 | Date: | 27.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4248116 | Date: | 27.09.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.05.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F16K31/06, F02M21/02, F16K31/40 | [2023/39] | CPC: |
F16K31/406 (EP,US);
F16K31/42 (CN);
F02M21/023 (EP);
F02M21/0239 (EP);
F02M21/0242 (EP);
F02M21/0245 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/39] | Title | German: | DIREKT VORGESTEUERTES HOCHDRUCKVENTIL | [2023/39] | English: | HIGH PRESSURE DIRECT PILOT ACTUATED VALVE | [2023/39] | French: | SOUPAPE À ACTIONNEMENT DIRECT PAR PILOTE À HAUTE PRESSION | [2023/39] | Entry into regional phase | 19.05.2023 | National basic fee paid | 19.05.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.05.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.05.2023 | Examination requested [2023/39] | 19.05.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0106161 (VERITEK NGV CANADA CORP [CA], et al) [A] 1-8 * figure 1 *; | [A]US8528590 (MESNER STEVEN [US]) [A] 1-8* figure 3 *; | [A]ES2591256T (COVAL [FR]) [A] 1-8 * figure 2 *; | [X]CN110043675 (HENAN ESCORT INDUSTRIAL CO LTD) [X] 1-8 * figures 1-3 * |