Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2024052193 | Global Dossier | 15.02.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2021EP85205 | 10.12.2021 | EP20213339 | 11.12.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20230118613 | Global Dossier | 11.08.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2021EP85205 | 10.12.2021 | EP20213339 | 11.12.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2023554182 | Global Dossier | 26.12.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2021EP85205 | 10.12.2021 | EP20213339 | 11.12.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN116745369 | Global Dossier | 12.09.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2021EP85205 | 10.12.2021 | EP20213339 | 11.12.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3204078 | Global Dossier | 16.06.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2021EP85205 | 10.12.2021 | EP20213339 | 11.12.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2021394066 | Global Dossier | 22.06.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2021EP85205 | 10.12.2021 | EP20213339 | 11.12.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4259730 | Global Dossier | 18.10.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2021EP85205 | 10.12.2021 | EP20213339 | 11.12.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2023006885 | 12.07.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2021EP85205 | 10.12.2021 | EP20213339 | 11.12.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2022123014 | Global Dossier | 16.06.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP20213339 | 11.12.2020 |