EP4259730 - PHOTONIC LACQUERING OF WIRES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.09.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.06.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 07.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] | 16.02.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Asta Energy Solutions AG Oed 1 2755 Oed / AT | [2024/10] |
Former [2023/42] | For all designated states Asta Energy Solutions GmbH Oed 1 2755 Oed / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CIRAK, Suljo 2755 Oed / AT | 02 /
STREHMEL, Bernd 47798 Krefeld / DE | 03 /
DRIESEN, Sascha 40724 Hilden / DE | [2023/42] | Representative(s) | Gassner, Birgitta, et al REDL Life Science Patent Attorneys Donau-City-Straße 11 1220 Wien / AT | [2023/42] | Application number, filing date | 21831026.6 | 10.12.2021 | [2023/42] | WO2021EP85205 | Priority number, date | EP20200213339 | 11.12.2020 Original published format: EP 20213339 | [2023/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022123014 | Date: | 16.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4259730 | Date: | 18.10.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.06.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C09D5/00, C09D7/63, C09D129/14, B05D7/20, C08K5/29 | [2023/42] | CPC: |
C09D5/00 (EP,KR);
C09D129/14 (EP,KR,US);
B05D3/0263 (EP,KR);
B05D3/06 (EP,KR);
B05D5/12 (EP,KR);
B05D7/20 (EP,KR);
C08K5/29 (EP,KR);
C08K5/3417 (EP,KR,US);
C09B23/083 (US);
C09B67/0063 (US);
C09D7/41 (US);
C09D7/63 (EP,KR);
H01B13/003 (US);
H01B13/065 (US);
H01B3/446 (US);
B05D2256/00 (EP,KR);
C08K5/0091 (US);
C08K5/42 (US);
| C-Set: |
C09D129/14, C08K5/3417 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/42] | Extension states | BA | 11.07.2023 | Title | German: | PHOTONISCHE LACKIERUNG VON DRÄHTEN | [2023/42] | English: | PHOTONIC LACQUERING OF WIRES | [2023/42] | French: | LAQUAGE PHOTONIQUE DE FILS | [2023/42] | Entry into regional phase | 11.07.2023 | National basic fee paid | 11.07.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.07.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.07.2023 | Examination requested [2023/42] | 11.07.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2007031672 (BOEHM FRANK-RAINER [DE], et al) [A] 1-21 * the whole document ** paragraph [0041]; claim 1 *; | [XYI]US2010310787 (LEHMANN URS [CH], et al) [X] 11,12,15-17 * the whole document * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0042]; example 3.1 * * paragraph [0017] * * paragraphs [0004] , [ 0018] , [ 0088]; claim 22 * [Y] 6,7,10,13,14 [I] 1-5,8,9,18-21; | [XYI] - SCHMITZ CHRISTIAN ET AL, "NIR-Sensitized Photoinitiated Radical Polymerization and Proton Generation with Cyanines and LED Arrays", PROGRESS IN ORGANIC COATINGS, ELSEVIER BV, NL, (20160317), vol. 100, doi:10.1016/J.PORGCOAT.2016.02.022, ISSN 0300-9440, pages 32 - 46, XP029775574 [X] 11-14,16 * the whole document * * paragraph 4.1.,4.2. and 5.;table 1 and 2; p. 33, left column, 3rd paragraph * [Y] 6,7,10,13,14 [I] 1-10,15,17-21 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.porgcoat.2016.02.022 | by applicant | DE10357360 | WO2006088272 | US2010310787 | WO2011015447 | - SCHMITZ C. et al., Progress in Organic Coatings, (20160000), vol. 100, pages 32 - 46 | - GOLDSCHMID A.STREITBERGER H-J., BASF-Handbuch Lackiertechnik. Vincentz: Hannover, (20020000), page 771 | - BROCK TGROTEKLAES MMISCHKE P, Lehrbuch der Lacktechnologie, Vincentz, (19980000), page 338 | - RSC Advances, (20150000), vol. 5, no. 86, pages 69915 - 69924 | - ChemPhotoChem, (20190000), vol. 3, no. 11, pages 1127 - 1132 | - ChemPhotoChem, (20170000), vol. 1, no. 1, pages 26 - 34 | - The Journal of Organic Chemistry, (20110000), vol. 76, no. 2, pages 391 - 395 | - Angewandte Chemie, (20040000), vol. 116, no. 16, pages 2116 - 2142 | - Lackformulierung und Lackrezeptur, (20050000), pages 146 - 158 | - SCHMITZ C. et al., Angew. Chem., Int. Ed., (20190000), vol. 58, no. 13, pages 4400 - 4404 | - PANG Y. et al., Angew. Chem. Int. Ed., (20200000), vol. 59, no. 28, pages 11440 - 11447 |