EP4247213 - GUTTER BROOM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.05.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.08.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.05.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 07.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.09.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Old Dominion Brush Company 5118 Glen Alden Dr Henrico, Virginia 23231 / US | [2023/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CALLOWAY, Britt R. Midlothian, Virginia 23112 / US | 02 /
COKER, Josh New Kend, Virginia 23124 / US | 03 /
MAYES, Robert Hanover, Virginia 23009 / US | 04 /
STUMPH, Tim Midlothian, Virginia 23114 / US | 05 /
TURNER, Chris Aylett, Virginia 23009 / US | [2023/39] | Representative(s) | Abel & Imray LLP Westpoint Building James Street West Bath BA1 2DA / GB | [2023/39] | Application number, filing date | 21831144.7 | 19.11.2021 | [2023/39] | WO2021US60121 | Priority number, date | US202063116263P | 20.11.2020 Original published format: US 202063116263 P | [2023/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022109290 | Date: | 27.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4247213 | Date: | 27.09.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.05.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A46B7/04, A46B13/00, A46B3/14, E01H1/05 | [2023/39] | CPC: |
A46B3/14 (EP);
A46B7/042 (US);
A46B13/008 (EP,US);
A46B3/16 (EP,US);
A46B7/044 (EP);
A46B9/02 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/39] | Title | German: | REGENRINNENBESEN | [2023/39] | English: | GUTTER BROOM | [2023/39] | French: | BALAI DE CANIVEAU | [2023/39] | Entry into regional phase | 15.06.2023 | National basic fee paid | 15.06.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.06.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/39] | 15.06.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.09.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAYI]FR2479713 (REISLANDER KG FABRIK TECH [DE]); | [A]WO2004086905 (SAJAKORPI OY [FI], et al); | [XY]JP2009108632 (KOWA CO) |