EP4256528 - AUTOMATED SCREENING FOR DIABETIC RETINOPATHY SEVERITY USING COLOR FUNDUS IMAGE DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.09.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.06.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 07.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] | 09.02.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Genentech, Inc. 1 DNA Way South San Francisco, CA 94080-4990 / US | For all designated states F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | [2023/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BENMANSOUR, Fethallah 4070 Basel / CH | 02 /
CAVALCANTI, Daniela Ferrara San Francisco, California 94080-4990 / US | [2023/41] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2023/41] | Application number, filing date | 21831187.6 | 03.12.2021 | [2023/41] | WO2021US61809 | Priority number, date | US202063121711P | 04.12.2020 Original published format: US 202063121711 P | US202163169809P | 01.04.2021 Original published format: US 202163169809 P | [2023/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022120168 | Date: | 09.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4256528 | Date: | 11.10.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.06.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06V10/82, A61B3/00 | [2023/41] | CPC: |
G06V10/82 (EP);
G16H50/20 (EP,US);
A61B3/0025 (EP);
A61B3/12 (EP,US);
A61B5/4842 (US);
G06T5/92 (US);
G06T7/0012 (US);
G06T7/11 (US);
G06T7/194 (US);
G16H30/40 (EP);
G16H50/30 (EP);
G16H50/70 (EP);
G06T2207/10024 (US);
G06T2207/20076 (US);
G06T2207/20084 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/41] | Title | German: | AUTOMATISIERTES SCREENING AUF SCHWERE DIABETISCHE RETINOPATHIE UNTER VERWENDUNG VON BILDDATEN DES FUNDUS | [2023/41] | English: | AUTOMATED SCREENING FOR DIABETIC RETINOPATHY SEVERITY USING COLOR FUNDUS IMAGE DATA | [2023/41] | French: | DIAGNOSTIC AUTOMATISÉ DE GRAVITÉ D'UNE RÉTINOPATHIE DIABÉTIQUE FAISANT APPEL À DES DONNÉES DE RÉTINOPHOTOGRAPHIE EN COULEUR | [2023/41] | Entry into regional phase | 14.06.2023 | National basic fee paid | 14.06.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.06.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/41] | 14.06.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI] - SAHLSTEN JAAKKO ET AL, "Deep Learning Fundus Image Analysis for Diabetic Retinopathy and Macular Edema Grading", vol. 9, no. 1, doi:10.1038/s41598-019-47181-w, (20190724), SCIENTIFIC REPORTS, URL: http://www.nature.com/articles/s41598-019-47181-w, (20220304), XP055897931 [X] 1,6,7,9,14,15,20 * abstract * * page 2, paragraphs 1-7 * [I] 2-5,8,10-13,16-19 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/s41598-019-47181-w | [XI] - MASOOD SARFARAZ ET AL, "Identification of diabetic retinopathy in eye images using transfer learning", 2017 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMPUTING, COMMUNICATION AND AUTOMATION (ICCCA), IEEE, (20170505), doi:10.1109/CCAA.2017.8229977, pages 1183 - 1187, XP033283678 [X] 1,6,7,9,14,15,20 * abstract * * sections II.A; IV.A * [I] 2-5,8,10-13,16-19 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CCAA.2017.8229977 | [A] - LE DAVID ET AL, "Deep learning for objective OCTA detection of diabetic retinopathy", PROGRESS IN BIOMEDICAL OPTICS AND IMAGING, SPIE - INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR OPTICAL ENGINEERING, BELLINGHAM, WA, US, (20200219), vol. 11218, doi:10.1117/12.2546586, ISSN 1605-7422, ISBN 978-1-5106-0027-0, pages 112181P - 112181P, XP060134386 [A] 5,13 * table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.2546586 | [T] - Browning David J., "Diabetic Retinopathy: Evidence-Based Management", Diabetic Retinopathy: Evidence-Based Management, (20100320), pages 95 - 95, XP055899278 [T] * figure 4.7 * | [T] - WILKINSON C.P ET AL, "Proposed international clinical diabetic retinopathy and diabetic macular edema disease severity scales", OPHTHALMOLOGY, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20030901), vol. 110, no. 9, doi:10.1016/S0161-6420(03)00475-5, ISSN 0161-6420, pages 1677 - 1682, XP055899222 [T] * abstract * * tables tables 1,2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0161-6420(03)00475-5 |