EP4259733 - FLAME RESISTANT BUILD MATERIALS AND ASSOCIATED PRINTED 3D ARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.09.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.06.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 07.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] | 16.02.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3D Systems, Inc. 333 Three D Systems Circle Rock Hill, SC 29730 / US | [2023/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOUSSA, Khalil Rock Hill, SC 29730 / US | [2023/42] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [2023/42] | Application number, filing date | 21831458.1 | 08.12.2021 | [2023/42] | WO2021US62413 | Priority number, date | US202063123739P | 10.12.2020 Original published format: US 202063123739 P | [2023/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022125668 | Date: | 16.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4259733 | Date: | 18.10.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.06.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C09D11/101, C09D11/38, C09D11/03, B33Y70/00, B33Y70/10 | [2023/42] | CPC: |
C09D11/101 (EP);
C08F222/22 (US);
B29C64/106 (US);
B33Y70/00 (EP,US);
B33Y80/00 (US);
C08K5/0066 (US);
C08K5/521 (US);
C09D11/03 (EP);
C09D11/38 (EP);
B33Y10/00 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/42] | Title | German: | FLAMMFESTE BAUMATERIALIEN UND ZUGEHÖRIGE GEDRUCKTE 3D-ARTIKEL | [2023/42] | English: | FLAME RESISTANT BUILD MATERIALS AND ASSOCIATED PRINTED 3D ARTICLES | [2023/42] | French: | MATÉRIAUX DE CONSTRUCTION RÉSISTANTS À LA FLAMME ET ARTICLES ASSOCIÉS IMPRIMÉS EN 3D | [2023/42] | Entry into regional phase | 02.06.2023 | National basic fee paid | 02.06.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.06.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/42] | 02.06.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO03005126 (SHOWA DENKO KK [JP], et al); | [X]WO2006107759 (BIRDS INC 3 [US], et al); | [I]WO2011114884 (KONICA MINOLTA OPTO INC [JP], et al); | [X]US2014131908 (SUN BENJAMIN JIEMIN [US], et al); | [Y]WO2017006173 (ALIGN TECHNOLOGY INC [US]); | [XA]US2018155530 (KING SCOTT B [US], et al) | by applicant | EP0223587 | US4751102 | US4772530 | US4772541 |