EP4174107 - POLYESTER COPOLYMER COMPRISING RECYCLED MONOMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.03.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | 07.06.2024 | Change - classification | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | 07.06.2024 | Change - classification | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SK Chemicals Co., Ltd. 310, Pangyo-ro Bundang-gu Seongnam-si, Gyeonggi-do 13494 / KR | [2023/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HWANG, Da-Young Seongnam-si, Gyeonggi-do 13494 / KR | 02 /
LEE, Yoo Jin Seongnam-si, Gyeonggi-do 13494 / KR | [2023/18] | Representative(s) | Berggren Oy P.O. Box 16 Eteläinen Rautatiekatu 10A 00101 Helsinki / FI | [2023/18] | Application number, filing date | 21831597.6 | 19.04.2021 | [2023/18] | WO2021KR04845 | Priority number, date | KR20200079641 | 29.06.2020 Original published format: KR 20200079641 | [2023/18] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022004995 | Date: | 06.01.2022 | Language: | KO | [2022/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4174107 | Date: | 03.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 06.01.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.2024 | Classification | IPC: | C08G63/12, C08G63/83, C08G63/85, C08L67/02 | [2023/18] | CPC: |
C08G63/183 (EP);
C08G63/12 (KR);
C08G63/127 (US);
C08G63/199 (EP);
C08G63/672 (EP);
C08G63/83 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/18] | Title | German: | POLYESTER-COPOLYMER MIT REZYKLIERTEN MONOMEREN | [2023/18] | English: | POLYESTER COPOLYMER COMPRISING RECYCLED MONOMERS | [2023/18] | French: | COPOLYMÈRE DE POLYESTER COMPRENANT DES MONOMÈRES RECYCLÉS | [2023/18] | Entry into regional phase | 04.07.2022 | Translation filed | 04.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 04.07.2022 | Search fee paid | 04.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.07.2022 | Examination requested [2023/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]KR20200061948 (LOTTE CHEMICAL CORP [KR]) | International search | [Y]KR100490000B ; | [Y]KR20120133548 ; | [Y]KR20140009117 (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP]); | [A]CN105367425 (AEROSPACE RESOURCE RECYCLING TECH CO LTD); | [A]KR20170138990 (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP]) |