EP4176365 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING AMOUNT OF SCREEN TIME OF AN INDIVIDUAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.04.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carter, Ashley 200 Railway Parade Kogarah NSW 2216 / AU | [2023/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2023/19] | Representative(s) | Fulton, David James, et al Lincoln IP 4 Rubislaw Place Aberdeen, Aberdeenshire, AB10 1XN / GB | [2023/19] | Application number, filing date | 21832217.0 | 05.07.2021 | [2023/19] | WO2021AU50716 | Priority number, date | AU20200902289 | 03.07.2020 Original published format: AU 2020902289 | [2023/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022000047 | Date: | 06.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4176365 | Date: | 10.05.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.01.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 06.01.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.06.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/62, G06F11/34, H04M1/72463, G06F21/84, G06Q10/1091, G06Q50/20 | [2024/30] | CPC: |
H04M1/72463 (EP,IL);
H04M1/724634 (AU);
G06F21/629 (EP,US);
G06F11/3438 (EP);
G06F21/84 (EP,IL);
G06F3/0482 (AU);
G06F3/04845 (AU);
G06Q10/1091 (EP,IL);
G06Q50/20 (EP,IL);
G06F11/3419 (EP);
G06F21/6218 (EP);
G06F2221/2137 (EP,US);
G06F2221/2149 (EP,US);
G06Q99/00 (AU);
H04M1/724094 (AU);
|
Former IPC [2023/19] | G06F21/62, G06F11/34, H04M1/72463 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/19] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG DER BILDSCHIRMZEITMENGE EINER PERSON | [2023/19] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING AMOUNT OF SCREEN TIME OF AN INDIVIDUAL | [2023/19] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE CONTRÔLE DU TEMPS PASSÉ DEVANT UN ÉCRAN D'UN INDIVIDU | [2023/19] | Entry into regional phase | 12.01.2023 | National basic fee paid | 12.01.2023 | Search fee paid | 12.01.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.01.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]WO2008094941 (SKIPPY & SPARKY PRODUCTIONS LL [US], et al); | [XY]US2019220290 (YU SHUANGXIN [CN]) | International search | [X]US2019026482 (KENNY BRIAN [US], et al); | [X]KR20190114566 (THEPLANG [KR]); | [X]WO2019200350 (LI2EI LLC [US]); |