EP4173739 - RARE EARTH-IRON-NITROGEN-BASED MAGNETIC POWDER, COMPOUND FOR BOND MAGNET, BOND MAGNET, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING RARE EARTH-IRON-NITROGEN-BASED MAGNETIC POWDER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.03.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tohoku University 2-1-1 Katahira Aoba-ku Sendai-shi, Miyagi 980-8577 / JP | For all designated states SUMITOMO METAL MINING CO., LTD. 11-3, Shimbashi 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8716 / JP | [2023/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUGIMOTO Satoshi Sendai-shi, Miyagi 980-8577 / JP | 02 /
MATSUURA Masashi Sendai-shi, Miyagi 980-8577 / JP | 03 /
ISHIKAWA Takashi Iwanai-gun, Hokkaido 048-2143 / JP | 04 /
YONEYAMA Yukinobu Iwanai-gun, Hokkaido 048-2143 / JP | [2023/18] | Representative(s) | Jones, Nicholas Andrew Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [2023/18] | Application number, filing date | 21832647.8 | 31.03.2021 | [2023/18] | WO2021JP13896 | Priority number, date | JP20200111144 | 29.06.2020 Original published format: JP 2020111144 | [2023/18] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022004081 | Date: | 06.01.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4173739 | Date: | 03.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.01.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B22F1/10, B22F1/17, C22C33/02, C22C38/00, H01F1/059, H01F1/06, H01F1/08 | [2023/51] | CPC: |
B22F1/17 (EP);
H01F1/0551 (US);
B22F1/05 (US);
B22F1/10 (EP,US);
C08K9/02 (US);
C22C33/0278 (EP);
C22C38/001 (EP,US);
C22C38/002 (EP);
C22C38/005 (EP,US);
H01F1/059 (EP);
H01F1/065 (EP);
H01F1/083 (EP);
B22F2301/355 (US);
B22F2304/10 (US);
B22F2998/10 (EP);
| C-Set: |
B22F2998/10, C22C1/1084, B22F9/20, B22F9/04, B22F1/142, B22F1/145, B22F1/10, B22F3/20 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2023/18] | B22F1/00, B22F3/00, C22C38/00, H01F1/059, H01F1/06, H01F41/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/18] | Title | German: | MAGNETISCHES PULVER AUF SELTENERD-EISEN-STICKSTOFF-BASIS, VERBINDUNG FÜR VERBUNDMAGNET, VERBUNDMAGNET UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES MAGNETISCHEN PULVERS AUF SELTENERD-EISEN-STICKSTOFF-BASIS | [2023/18] | English: | RARE EARTH-IRON-NITROGEN-BASED MAGNETIC POWDER, COMPOUND FOR BOND MAGNET, BOND MAGNET, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING RARE EARTH-IRON-NITROGEN-BASED MAGNETIC POWDER | [2023/18] | French: | POUDRE MAGNÉTIQUE À BASE DE TERRES RARES-FER-AZOTE, COMPOSÉ POUR AIMANT DE LIAISON, AIMANT DE LIAISON ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE POUDRE MAGNÉTIQUE À BASE DE TERRES RARES-FER-AZOTE | [2023/18] | Entry into regional phase | 09.01.2023 | Translation filed | 09.01.2023 | National basic fee paid | 09.01.2023 | Search fee paid | 09.01.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.01.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/18] | 24.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JP2006269637 (SUMITOMO METAL MINING CO) [X] 1,4-8 * paragraphs [0068] - [0070]; examples 1-7; table 1 *[A] 2,3,9-15; | [XA]WO2018096733 (UNIV TOHOKU [JP], et al) [X] 1,4-8 * paragraphs [0097] , [0 98]; example 1 * [A] 2,3,9-15; | [XA]JP2018090892 (UNIV TOHOKU, et al) [X] 1,4-8 * paragraphs [0097] , [0 98]; example 1 * [A] 2,3,9-15; | [XA]JP2018127716 (UNIV TOHOKU, et al) [X] 1,4-8 * paragraphs [0110] , [ 111]; example 1 * [A] 2,3,9-15 | International search | [A]JP2004111515 (SUMITOMO METAL MINING CO) [A] 1-15 * , entire text *; | [A]JP2007270303 (TODA KOGYO CORP) [A] 1-15 * , entire text *; | [A]JP2018120942 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1-15* , entire text *; | [A]JP2020057779 (TDK CORP, et al) [A] 1-15 * , entire text * | by applicant | JPH0855712 | JP2003168602 | JP2005272986 | JP5071160B | - IEEJ Transactions on Fundamentals and Materials, (20040000), vol. 124, page 881 | - Proc. 12th Int. Workshop on RE Magnets and their Applications, (19920000), page 218 |