EP4142404 - INDICATION METHOD FOR MULTIPLE RESOURCE UNITS FOR TRANSMISSION, AND RELATED DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.01.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.05.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 01.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2023/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YU, Jian Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2023/09] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/09] | Huawei European IPR Huawei Technologies Duesseldorf GmbH Riesstraße 25 80992 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 21833376.3 | 29.06.2021 | [2023/09] | WO2021CN103121 | Priority number, date | CN202010615549 | 30.06.2020 Original published format: CN202010615549 | [2023/09] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022002056 | Date: | 06.01.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4142404 | Date: | 01.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 06.01.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/04, H04L5/00 | [2023/44] | CPC: |
H04L5/0094 (EP,US);
H04W72/0453 (CN);
H04L5/0044 (EP,US);
H04L5/0053 (EP);
H04W72/044 (US);
H04W72/53 (CN);
|
Former IPC [2023/09] | H04W72/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/09] | Title | German: | ANZEIGEVERFAHREN FÜR MEHRERE RESSOURCENEINHEITEN ZUR ÜBERTRAGUNG UND ZUGEHÖRIGE VORRICHTUNG | [2023/09] | English: | INDICATION METHOD FOR MULTIPLE RESOURCE UNITS FOR TRANSMISSION, AND RELATED DEVICE | [2023/09] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'INDICATION POUR DE MULTIPLES UNITÉS DE RESSOURCE AUX FINS DE TRANSMISSION, ET DISPOSITIF ASSOCIÉ | [2023/09] | Entry into regional phase | 22.11.2022 | Translation filed | 22.11.2022 | National basic fee paid | 22.11.2022 | Search fee paid | 22.11.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.11.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.11.2022 | Examination requested [2023/09] | 30.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.04.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed |