EP4175689 - NANOFIBER REINFORCEMENT OF ATTACHED HYDROGELS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.04.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.06.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Duke University 2812 Erwin Road, Suite 406 Durham, NC 27705 / US | [2023/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WILEY, Benjamin, J. Durham, NC 27705 / US | 02 /
TONG, Huayu Durham, NC 27705 / US | 03 /
ZHAO, Jiacheng Durham, NC 27705 / US | [2023/19] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [2023/19] | Application number, filing date | 21833727.7 | 01.07.2021 | [2023/19] | WO2021US40031 | Priority number, date | US202063046944P | 01.07.2020 Original published format: US 202063046944 P | US202163183670P | 04.05.2021 Original published format: US 202163183670 P | [2023/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022006363 | Date: | 06.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4175689 | Date: | 10.05.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.01.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.01.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.06.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A61L27/52, A61F2/30, A61L27/48 | [2023/19] | CPC: |
A61L27/52 (EP,CN,IL,US);
A61L27/06 (EP,CN,IL);
A61L24/02 (IL,US);
A61L27/20 (IL,US);
A61L27/306 (IL,US);
A61L27/32 (IL,US);
A61L27/34 (CN,IL,US);
A61L27/3608 (IL,US);
A61L27/48 (EP,IL);
A61L27/50 (CN);
A61L27/56 (EP,CN,IL);
C08L29/04 (IL);
| C-Set: |
A61L27/34, C08L1/02 (CN);
A61L27/34, C08L29/04 (CN);
A61L27/34, C08L33/24 (CN);
A61L27/48, C08L29/04 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/19] | Title | German: | NANOFASERVERSTÄRKUNG VON BEFESTIGTEN HYDROGELEN | [2023/19] | English: | NANOFIBER REINFORCEMENT OF ATTACHED HYDROGELS | [2023/19] | French: | RENFORCEMENT PAR NANOFIBRES D'HYDROGELS FIXÉS | [2023/19] | Entry into regional phase | 10.01.2023 | National basic fee paid | 10.01.2023 | Search fee paid | 10.01.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.01.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/19] | 03.08.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2005287187 (MANSMANN KEVIN A [US]); | [Y]US2008241214 (MYUNG DAVID [US], et al); | [Y]US2013274892 (LELKES PETER I [US], et al); | [A]WO2018204315 (NEW YORK SOC RUPTURED & CRIPPLED MAINTAINING HOSPITAL FOR SPECIAL SURGERY [US]); | [Y]WO2019094426 (UNIV DUKE [US]); | [PX]WO2021067145 (UNIV DUKE [US]); |