Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
24.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
04.06.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
04.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant | |
17.11.2023 | Supplementary search report | published on 20.12.2023 [2023/51] |
17.11.2023 | Change - classification | published on 20.12.2023 [2023/51] |
17.11.2023 | Change - classification | published on 20.12.2023 [2023/51] |
01.09.2023 | Change: Validation states | published on 04.10.2023 [2023/40] |
01.09.2023 | Change - extension states | published on 04.10.2023 [2023/40] |
22.06.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
31.03.2023 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 03.05.2023 [2023/18] |
31.03.2023 | Request for examination filed | published on 03.05.2023 [2023/18] |
13.03.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
16.01.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
02.01.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
20.12.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
16.12.2022 | Change - representative | |
16.12.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
24.01.2022 | New entry: applicant or inventor | |
07.01.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
07.01.2022 | New entry: applicant or inventor |