Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN115803290 | Global Dossier | 14.03.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2020113487 | 30.06.2020 | WO2021JP24618 | 29.06.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4174033 | Global Dossier | 20.12.2023 | A4 | EP4174033 | 03.05.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2020113487 | 30.06.2020 | WO2021JP24618 | 29.06.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2022004743 | Global Dossier | 06.01.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2020113487 | 30.06.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7409981B | Global Dossier | 09.01.2024 | B2 | JP2022022662 | 07.02.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2020113487 | 30.06.2020 |