20.08.2024 |
Change - representative |
|
27.07.2024 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
01.06.2024 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
28.03.2024 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.02.2024 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
04.12.2023 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
01.09.2023 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 04.10.2023 [2023/40] |
01.09.2023 |
Change - extension states |
published on 04.10.2023 [2023/40] |
09.08.2023 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
04.08.2023 |
First examination report |
|
31.05.2023 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
31.05.2023 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
20.03.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.11.2022 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 28.12.2022 [2022/52] |
25.11.2022 |
Change - classification |
published on 28.12.2022 [2022/52] |
17.06.2022 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 20.07.2022 [2022/29] |
17.06.2022 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 20.07.2022 [2022/29] |
11.05.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.04.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.04.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.04.2022 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
11.04.2022 |
Change - representative |
|
11.04.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
24.01.2022 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|
07.01.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.01.2022 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|