EP4030429 - SENSE AMPLIFIER, STORAGE DEVICE AND READING AND WRITING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.08.2023 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.06.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Changxin Memory Technologies, Inc. No. 388, Xingye Avenue Airport Industrial Park Economic and Technological Development Area Hefei, Anhui 230601 / CN | [2022/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Ying Shanghai 200051 / CN | 02 /
CHI, Sunsoo Shanghai 200051 / CN | [2022/29] | Representative(s) | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstraße 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/29] | V.O. P.O. Box 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 21834364.8 | 10.03.2021 | [2022/29] | WO2021CN79898 | Priority number, date | CN202010615819 | 30.06.2020 Original published format: CN202010615819 | [2022/29] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022001163 | Date: | 06.01.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4030429 | Date: | 20.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 06.01.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G11C7/06 | [2022/29] | CPC: |
G11C7/065 (EP,US);
G11C7/062 (CN);
G11C11/4091 (EP,US);
G11C7/06 (EP);
G11C7/08 (EP,CN);
G11C7/12 (US);
G11C11/4097 (EP);
G11C11/4099 (EP);
G11C2207/002 (EP);
G11C2207/005 (EP);
G11C5/025 (EP);
G11C7/14 (EP);
G11C7/18 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/29] | Title | German: | MESSVERSTÄRKER, SPEICHERVORRICHTUNG UND LESE- UND SCHREIBVERFAHREN | [2022/29] | English: | SENSE AMPLIFIER, STORAGE DEVICE AND READING AND WRITING METHOD | [2022/29] | French: | AMPLIFICATEUR DE DÉTECTION, DISPOSITIF DE STOCKAGE ET PROCÉDÉ DE LECTURE ET D'ÉCRITURE | [2022/29] | Entry into regional phase | 11.04.2022 | Translation filed | 11.04.2022 | National basic fee paid | 11.04.2022 | Search fee paid | 11.04.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.04.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/29] | 31.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.05.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.08.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.12.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.05.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.07.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2011080796 (BRUENNERT MICHAEL [DE], et al); | [A]US8432762 (KIM JOUNG-YEAL [KR], et al); | [I]US2017365308 (CHA SOO-HO [KR], et al); | [A]US2019189192 (KIM KYUNGRYUN [KR], et al) | International search | [A]JPH0198187 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1-20* entire document *; | [XY]CN102881318 (SUZHOU XEL TECHNOLOGY INC) [X] 1,4-6,20 * description, paragraphs [0029]-[0062], figure 2 * [Y] 2-3,7-19; | [A]CN210156119U (CHANGXIN MEMORY TECH INC) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [Y]CN210575115U (CHANGXIN MEMORY TECH INC) [Y] 2-3,7-19 * description, paragraphs [0044]-[0065] *; | [PX]CN212303080U (CHANGXIN MEMORY TECH INC) [PX] 1-20 * entire document * |