EP4178292 - BEAM INDICATION METHOD AND APPARATUS, AND TERMINAL AND NETWORK SIDE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.04.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Datang Mobile Communications Equipment Co., Ltd. 1/F, Building 1, No. 5 Shangdi East Road Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | [2023/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Hui Beijing 100085 / CN | 02 /
CHEN, Runhua Beijing 100085 / CN | 03 /
GAO, Qiubin Beijing 100085 / CN | 04 /
LUO, Yajuan Beijing 100085 / CN | [2023/19] | Representative(s) | Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2023/19] | Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 21834687.2 | 01.07.2021 | [2023/19] | WO2021CN104009 | Priority number, date | CN202010636191 | 03.07.2020 Original published format: CN202010636191 | CN202010694065 | 17.07.2020 Original published format: CN202010694065 | CN202011138452 | 22.10.2020 Original published format: CN202011138452 | [2023/19] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022002201 | Date: | 06.01.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4178292 | Date: | 10.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 06.01.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.11.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/04, H04B7/06, H04L5/00 | [2023/51] | CPC: |
H04B7/0695 (EP);
H04L5/0048 (EP,CN);
H04B7/06968 (US);
H04B7/0639 (EP,US);
H04L5/0053 (CN,US);
H04L5/0094 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2023/19] | H04W72/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/19] | Title | German: | STRAHLANZEIGEVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG SOWIE ENDGERÄT UND NETZWERKSEITIGE VORRICHTUNG | [2023/19] | English: | BEAM INDICATION METHOD AND APPARATUS, AND TERMINAL AND NETWORK SIDE DEVICE | [2023/19] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL D'INDICATION DE FAISCEAU, TERMINAL ET DISPOSITIF CÔTÉ RÉSEAU | [2023/19] | Entry into regional phase | 13.01.2023 | Translation filed | 13.01.2023 | National basic fee paid | 13.01.2023 | Search fee paid | 13.01.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.01.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/19] | 12.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.06.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2020035017 (CHINA ACADEMY TELECOMMUNICATIONS TECHNOLOGY [CN]) [X] 1,2,4-6,9,10,13-15 * the whole document * [I] 3,7,8,11,12; | US2021329624 [ ] (HUANG QIUPING [CN], et al) [ ] * paragraph [0073] - paragraph [0076] * * paragraph [0164] - paragraph [0166] * * paragraph [0201] - paragraph [0211] * * paragraph [0217] - paragraph [0218] ** figures 2-9 * |