EP4271491 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR STREAMING INTERACTIVE APPLICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.10.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.07.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 10.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 10.04.2024 [2024/15] | 08.03.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 10.04.2024 [2024/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | [2023/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOSIER, Scott David Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 02 /
GORDON, Matthew Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | [2023/45] | Representative(s) | CMS Cameron McKenna Nabarro Olswang LLP Cannon Place 78 Cannon Street London EC4N 6AF / GB | [2023/45] | Application number, filing date | 21835005.6 | 29.11.2021 | [2023/45] | WO2021US60912 | Priority number, date | US202117140880 | 04.01.2021 Original published format: US202117140880 | [2023/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022146590 | Date: | 07.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4271491 | Date: | 08.11.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.07.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A63F13/355 | [2023/45] | CPC: |
A63F13/355 (EP,US);
A63F13/352 (US);
A63F13/86 (EP,US);
G06N20/00 (US);
H04N19/40 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/45] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUM STREAMEN INTERAKTIVER ANWENDUNGEN | [2023/45] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR STREAMING INTERACTIVE APPLICATIONS | [2023/45] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS POUR DIFFUSION CONTINUE D'APPLICATIONS INTERACTIVES | [2023/45] | Entry into regional phase | 20.06.2023 | National basic fee paid | 20.06.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.06.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/45] | 20.06.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]US2011126255 (PERLMAN STEPHEN G [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0111] * * paragraph [0121] * * paragraph [0124] * * paragraph [0125] * * paragraph [0153] - paragraph [0154] * * paragraph [0176] - paragraph [0177] * * paragraph [0185] - paragraph [0196] * * paragraph [0263] *; | [I]US2014195594 (AHUJA ALOK [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0049] * * paragraph [0056] - paragraph [0061] * * paragraph [0068] - paragraph [0071] *; | [A]US2015127775 (MUNAGALA RAMANA V [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0025] ** paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0031] *; | [I]US2015131969 (TARAKI QUAIS [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0058] * * paragraph [0067] * * paragraph [0070] *; | [I]US2020252682 (WALKER PETER ANTHONY [US]) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0080] * * paragraph [0105] - paragraph [0110] * * paragraph [0001] * |