EP4255713 - METHOD FOR EXTRUDING A SEMI-FINISHED PRODUCT MADE OF ELASTOMERIC MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.09.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.06.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 11.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 06.03.2024 [2024/10] | 02.02.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 06.03.2024 [2024/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pirelli Tyre S.p.A. Viale Piero e Alberto Pirelli, 25 20126 Milano / IT | [2023/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AMURRI, Cesare Emanuele 20099 Sesto San Giovanni (Milano) / IT | 02 /
CICOGNANI, Fabio 20126 Milano / IT | 03 /
SCHIAVON, Emanuele Luca 20021 Bollate (Milano) / IT | [2023/41] | Representative(s) | Porta & Consulenti Associati S.p.A. Via Vittoria Colonna, 4 20149 Milano / IT | [2023/41] | Application number, filing date | 21835376.1 | 30.11.2021 | [2023/41] | WO2021IB61099 | Priority number, date | IT20200029222 | 01.12.2020 Original published format: IT202000029222 | [2023/41] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022118182 | Date: | 09.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4255713 | Date: | 11.10.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.06.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B29C48/37, B29C48/92, B29L30/00 | [2023/41] | CPC: |
B29C48/37 (EP,US);
B29C48/14 (US);
B29C48/0012 (US);
B29C48/2552 (US);
B29C48/92 (EP,US);
B29C2948/92019 (EP,US);
B29L2030/00 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/41] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM EXTRUDIEREN EINES HALBZEUGS AUS ELASTOMEREM MATERIAL | [2023/41] | English: | METHOD FOR EXTRUDING A SEMI-FINISHED PRODUCT MADE OF ELASTOMERIC MATERIAL | [2023/41] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'EXTRUSION D'UN PRODUIT SEMI-FINI COMPOSÉ D'UN MATÉRIAU ÉLASTOMÈRE | [2023/41] | Entry into regional phase | 05.04.2023 | National basic fee paid | 05.04.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.04.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.04.2023 | Examination requested [2023/41] | 05.04.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4721589 (HARRIS HOLTON E [US]) [Y] 1-15 * column 5, line 14 - line 63; figure 2; claim 25 * * column 2, line 3 - line 64 * * column 7, line 4 - line 26 *; | [Y]DE10129707 (ROEHM GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0019]; figure - *; | [Y]JP2006327174 (NITTO DENKO CORP) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0002] - [0007] - [0035] , [0036]; figure - *; | [YD]JP2007237508 (TOYO TIRE & RUBBER CO) [YD] 1-15 * paragraphs [0012] , [0021]; figure - *; | [YD]JP2008229967 (TOYO TIRE & RUBBER CO) [YD] 1-15 * abstract *; | [Y]JP2012000949 (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [Y] 1-15* paragraphs [0012] , [0013]; figure - * |