Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP4260149
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
16.02.2024 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] |
16.02.2024 |
Change - extension states |
published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] |
22.01.2024 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
03.01.2024 |
Change - representative |
|
03.01.2024 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.09.2023 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 18.10.2023 [2023/42] |
15.09.2023 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
15.09.2023 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 18.10.2023 [2023/42] |
25.08.2023 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.07.2023 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.06.2023 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
24.05.2023 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.05.2023 |
Change - representative |
|
23.05.2023 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.06.2022 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|
25.06.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.06.2022 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|
16.03.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.01.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|