EP4274883 - DETERGENT COMPOSITION COMPRISING, AS THICKENING AGENT, A COMPOSITION HAVING POLAR MEDIA THICKENING PROPERTIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.10.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.07.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 14.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Société d'Exploitation de Produits pour les Industries Chimiques SEPPIC 75 Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris cedex 07 / FR | [2023/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BODOC, Miruna 81100 Castres / FR | 02 /
MONTEILLET, Stéphane 81100 Castres / FR | [2023/46] | Representative(s) | Alatis 3, rue Paul Escudier 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2023/46] | Air Liquide L'Air Liquide S.A. Direction de la Propriété Intellectuelle 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 21836214.3 | 22.12.2021 | [2023/46] | WO2021EP87359 | Priority number, date | FR20210000111 | 07.01.2021 Original published format: FR 2100111 | [2023/46] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022148662 | Date: | 14.07.2022 | Language: | FR | [2022/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4274883 | Date: | 15.11.2023 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.07.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C11D17/00, C11D3/37, C11D11/00 | [2023/46] | CPC: |
C11D17/0026 (EP,US);
C11D11/00 (EP);
C11D3/3719 (EP,US);
C11D2111/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/46] | Title | German: | WASCHMITTELZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT EINER ZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT POLAREN MEDIENVERDICKUNGSEIGENSCHAFTEN ALS VERDICKUNGSMITTEL | [2023/46] | English: | DETERGENT COMPOSITION COMPRISING, AS THICKENING AGENT, A COMPOSITION HAVING POLAR MEDIA THICKENING PROPERTIES | [2023/46] | French: | COMPOSITION DÉTERGENTE COMPRENANT COMME AGENT ÉPAISSISSANT UNE COMPOSITION QUI PRÉSENTE DES PROPRIÉTÉS ÉPAISSISSANTES DE MILIEUX POLAIRES | [2023/46] | Entry into regional phase | 07.08.2023 | National basic fee paid | 07.08.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.08.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.08.2023 | Examination requested [2023/46] | 07.08.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2010150148 (TOYO BOSEKI) [A] 1-17 * paragraph [0093]; examples 5-10 *; | [A]CN107376010 (SHANDONG ACAD PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCES) [A] 1-17* example - *; | [Y]WO2018222545 (ECOVIA RENEWABLES INC [US]) [Y] 1-4,6-12,14-17 * paragraph [0044]; example -; claim 11 *; | [Y]FR3073853 (SOC DEXPLOITATION DE PRODUITS POUR LES INDUSTRIES CHIMIQUES SEPPIC [FR]) [Y] 1-4,6-12,14-17 * paragraph [0046]; claims 9-11, 20 * | by applicant | - CAS, no. 3891-98-3 | - DANIEL VOETJUDITH G. VOET, Biochemistry, John Wyley & Sons, (19900000), page 250 |