EP4262428 - MILK REPLACER COMPRISING ANIMAL-FREE FORMULATIONS OF FAT-SOLUBLE VITAMINS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.09.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.06.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 14.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.02.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 27.03.2024 [2024/13] | 23.02.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 27.03.2024 [2024/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DSM IP Assets B.V. Het Overloon 1 6411 TE Heerlen / NL | [2023/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LINDEMANN, Thomas 4303 Kaiseraugst / CH | 02 /
TSEKOU, Christos 4303 Kaiseraugst / CH | 03 /
URBAN, Kai 4303 Kaiseraugst / CH | 04 /
SCHAEFER, Christian 4303 Kaiseraugst / CH | [2023/43] | Representative(s) | Kraus & Lederer PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/43] | Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Unsöldstraße 2 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 21836572.4 | 16.12.2021 | [2023/43] | WO2021EP86339 | Priority number, date | EP20200215811 | 18.12.2020 Original published format: EP 20215811 | [2023/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022129435 | Date: | 23.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4262428 | Date: | 25.10.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.06.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A23K20/163, A23K20/174, A23K30/20, A23K40/10, A23K50/60, A23K50/10, A23L29/25, A23C11/00, A23L2/39 | [2023/43] | CPC: |
A23C11/00 (EP);
A23K20/163 (EP);
A23K20/174 (EP);
A23K30/20 (EP);
A23K40/10 (EP);
A23K50/10 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A23V2002/00, A23V2200/264, A23V2250/5028, A23V2250/5118, A23V2250/702 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/43] | Title | German: | MILCHERSATZ MIT TIERFREIEN FORMULIERUNGEN VON FETTLÖSLICHEN VITAMINEN | [2023/43] | English: | MILK REPLACER COMPRISING ANIMAL-FREE FORMULATIONS OF FAT-SOLUBLE VITAMINS | [2023/43] | French: | SUCCÉDANÉ DE LAIT COMPORTANT DES FORMULATIONS D'ORIGINE NON ANIMALE DE VITAMINES LIPOSOLUBLES | [2023/43] | Entry into regional phase | 10.07.2023 | National basic fee paid | 10.07.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.07.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.07.2023 | Examination requested [2023/43] | 10.07.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2298137 (BASF AG [DE]) [A] 1-15 * page 2, line 25 - line 27 * * page 5, line 9 - line 28 *; | [XI]US2011081330 (HITZFELD ANDREA [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,6,9,10,12,15 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0088]; examples 1-2; claim -; table 1 * [I] 4,5,7,8,11,13,14; | [A]US2014272073 (SMITH GARY FRANCIS [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0005] *; | [I]EP2118146 (DSM IP ASSETS BV [NL]) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0104]; example -; table - *; | [A] - WARD PHILIP J., "Milk powders - calf milk replacers", Journal of the Society of Dairy Technology, Vd. 34, No. 4, vol. 34, no. 4, doi:1471-0307.1981.tb01517.x, (19811004), pages 162 - 164, JOURNAL OF THE SOCIETY OF DAIRY TECHNOLOGY, URL: https://onlinelibrary.wiley.com/doi/pdfdirect/10.1111/j.1471-0307.1981.tb01517.x, XP055794453 [A] 1-15 * page 162, column 2, paragraph last; tables 1-3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/1471-0307.1981.tb01517.x | [A] - S.M OLHERO ET AL, "Influence of particle size distribution on rheology and particle packing of silica-based suspensions", POWDER TECHNOLOGY, Basel (CH), (20040105), vol. 139, no. 1, doi:10.1016/j.powtec.2003.10.004, ISSN 0032-5910, pages 69 - 75, XP055228538 [A] 1-15 * page 70, column 1, line 25 - line 33 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.powtec.2003.10.004 | [A] - PALZER ET AL, "Food structures for nutrition, health and wellness", TRENDS IN FOOD SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, GB, vol. 20, no. 5, doi:10.1016/J.TIFS.2009.02.005, ISSN 0924-2244, (20090501), pages 194 - 200, (20090312), XP026158919 [A] 1-15 * page 198, column 1, paragraph 2; figure 4c * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.tifs.2009.02.005 | by applicant | WO9106292 | EP0494417 | WO2006053761 | WO2008110225 | WO2017017248 | CN109517080 | WO2019185894 | WO2019185938 | WO2019185900 | WO2019185898 | WO2019185940 | WO2019185904 | WO2019185942 | WO2019185888 | WO2020093962 | WO2020093919 | WO2020093960 | - W. DZWOKAKS. ZIAJKA, Journal of food science, (19990000), vol. 64, no. 3, pages 393 - 395 |