EP4203914 - ORAL CARE COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING ASCORBIC ACID DERIVATIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.03.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.06.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.06.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 14.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Colgate-Palmolive Company 300 Park Avenue New York, NY 10022 / US | [2023/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NORTH, Michael Middlesex, New Jersey 08846 / US | 02 /
CARROLL, Keith Robbinsville, New Jersey 08691 / US | 03 /
GRONLUND, Jennifer Flemington, New Jersey 08822 / US | [2023/27] | Representative(s) | Sonnenhauser, Thomas Martin Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/27] | Sonnenhauser, Thomas Martin Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 21836722.5 | 09.12.2021 | [2023/27] | WO2021US62627 | Priority number, date | US202063123016P | 09.12.2020 Original published format: US 202063123016 P | [2023/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022125786 | Date: | 16.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4203914 | Date: | 05.07.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.06.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/67, A61Q11/00 | [2023/27] | CPC: |
A61K8/676 (EP,US);
A61K8/21 (US);
A61K8/27 (US);
A61Q11/00 (EP,US);
A61K2800/28 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/27] | Title | German: | MUNDPFLEGEZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT ASCORBINSÄUREDERIVATEN | [2023/27] | English: | ORAL CARE COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING ASCORBIC ACID DERIVATIVES | [2023/27] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DE SOINS BUCCAUXDENTAIRES COMPRENANT DES DÉRIVÉS D'ACIDE ASCORBIQUE | [2023/27] | Entry into regional phase | 30.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 30.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/27] | 30.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.07.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]JPH10245328 (KAO CORP); | [X]JPH1143424 (KAO CORP); | [X]WO2004041228 (DSM IP ASSETS BV [NL], et al); | [X]US2004175332 (WESTENFELDER HORST [DE]); | [XA]JP2005075825 (LION CORP); | [X]JP2005239654 (NIPPON ZETTOC CO LTD); | [X]JP2005320321 (SANGI KK); | [XA]JP2007297295 (KAO CORP); | [X]JP2007308443 (LION CORP); | [X]US2008057007 (LEONHARDT CHARLES [US], et al); | [X]US2008112903 (MONTGOMERY ROBERT ERIC [US]); | [X]WO2010074025 (LION CORP [JP], et al); | [X]US2019076496 (INAGAKI YOSUKE [JP], et al); | [X]US2019185499 (HAO ZHIGANG [US], et al) |