EP4178917 - SEPARATOR FOR WASTEWATER SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.04.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jets AS Myravegen 1 6060 Hareid / NO | [2023/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SKOMSØY, Jan Helge 6014 Ålesund / NO | [2023/20] | Representative(s) | Bryn Aarflot AS Patent Stortingsgata 8 0161 Oslo / NO | [2023/20] | Application number, filing date | 21837349.6 | 06.07.2021 | [2023/20] | WO2021NO50162 | Priority number, date | NO20200000816 | 10.07.2020 Original published format: NO 20200816 | [2023/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022010361 | Date: | 13.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4178917 | Date: | 17.05.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.01.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | XN | 13.01.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.06.2024 | Classification | IPC: | C02F1/00, B01D29/56, B01D35/16, E03C1/26, B01D29/13, B01D29/52, B01D29/64, E03F1/00, E03F5/14 | [2024/27] | CPC: |
B01D29/52 (EP);
C02F1/00 (NO);
E03F5/14 (EP,US);
B01D17/00 (NO);
B01D21/00 (NO);
B01D29/00 (NO);
B01D29/13 (EP);
B01D29/6484 (EP);
B01D35/00 (NO);
B01D35/02 (US);
B01D35/16 (EP,US);
B01D36/00 (NO);
C02F1/001 (EP);
C02F11/00 (NO);
C02F3/00 (NO);
C02F9/00 (NO);
E03F1/00 (NO);
E03F1/007 (EP,US);
E03F3/00 (NO);
E03F5/00 (NO);
B01D2201/00 (NO);
C02F2201/00 (NO);
C02F2201/004 (EP);
C02F2201/005 (EP);
Y02W10/00 (NO)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/20] | C02F1/00, B01D29/56, B01D35/16, E03C1/26 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/20] | Title | German: | ABSCHEIDER FÜR EIN ABWASSERSYSTEM | [2023/20] | English: | SEPARATOR FOR WASTEWATER SYSTEM | [2023/20] | French: | SÉPARATEUR POUR SYSTÈME DE TRAITEMENT DES EAUX USÉES | [2023/20] | Entry into regional phase | 24.01.2023 | National basic fee paid | 24.01.2023 | Search fee paid | 24.01.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.01.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE8632305U ; | [A]EP1161292 (BISCHOF RUDOLF GMBH [DE]); | [XI]CN105478010 (UNIV QINGDAO SCIENCE & TECHNOLOGY ); | [XI]US2019329165 (BACKMAN SUNE V [US], et al) | International search | [Y]US4307476 (HALSTAD OWEN M); | [XY]CN105478010 (UNIV QINGDAO SCIENCE & TECHNOLOGY ); | [A]CN208071462U (JIANGSU PROVINCE JIAQING WATER SERVICES CO LTD); | [A]CN210434092U (JIANGXI GANQING ENVIRONMENTAL PROT EQUIPMENT CO LTD) |