EP4175670 - HEPARANASE-NEUTRALIZING A54 MONOCLONAL ANTIBODY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.04.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Technion Research & Development Foundation Limited Senate Building Technion City, Haifa 3200004 / IL | For all designated states Hadasit Medical Research Services and Development Ltd. Jerusalem BioPark Hadassah Ein Kerem Medical Center P.O. Box 12000 9112001 Jerusalem / IL | [2023/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VLODAVSKY, Israel 9075734 Mevasseret Zion / IL | 02 /
BARASH, Uri 3436759 Haifa / IL | 03 /
WU, Liang Didcot Oxfordshire OX11 0FA / GB | [2023/19] | Representative(s) | Pearl Cohen Zedek Latzer Baratz UK LLP The Gridiron Building One Pancras Square London N1C 4AG / GB | [2023/19] | Application number, filing date | 21838737.1 | 06.07.2021 | [2023/19] | WO2021IL50830 | Priority number, date | US202063048211P | 06.07.2020 Original published format: US 202063048211 P | [2023/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022009203 | Date: | 13.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4175670 | Date: | 10.05.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.01.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | IL | 13.01.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.06.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/395, C12N9/24, C07K16/40, A61K31/69, A61K31/7068, A61K39/00, A61P35/00, A61P35/04, A61K45/06 | [2024/30] | CPC: |
C12Y302/01166 (EP);
C07K16/40 (EP,US);
A61K31/69 (EP,US);
A61K31/7068 (EP,US);
A61K39/3955 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP,US);
A61P35/04 (EP,US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/69, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/7068, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K39/3955, A61K2300/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2023/19] | A61K39/395, C12N9/24, C07K16/40 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/19] | Title | German: | HEPARANASE NEUTRALISIERENDER A54-MONOKLONALER ANTIKÖRPER | [2023/19] | English: | HEPARANASE-NEUTRALIZING A54 MONOCLONAL ANTIBODY | [2023/19] | French: | ANTICORPS MONOCLONAL A54 NEUTRALISANT L'HÉPARANASE | [2023/19] | Entry into regional phase | 31.01.2023 | National basic fee paid | 31.01.2023 | Search fee paid | 31.01.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.01.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2010041060 (MEDIMMUNE LTD [GB], et al); | International search | [X]WO2004108065 (INSIGHT BIOPHARMACEUTICALS LTD [IL], et al); | [XX]WO2017064716 (RAPPAPORT FAMILY INST FOR RES [IL]) |