EP4259555 - DISCHARGE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.09.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.06.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 17.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Change - applicant | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Interroll Holding AG Via Gorelle 3 6592 Sant'Antonino / CH | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/34] | For all designated states Interroll Holding AG Via Gorelle 3 6592 Sant' Antonino / CH | ||
Former [2023/42] | For all designated states Interroll Holding AG Zona Industriale Via Gorelle 3 6592 Sant' Antonino / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DUDEK, Siegmund 41836 Hückelhoven / DE | 02 /
HAGMAIER, Christian 41836 Hückelhoven / DE | [2023/42] | Representative(s) | Kohlhof, Stephan Interroll Innovation GmbH Opelstr. 1 41836 Hückelhoven / DE | [2023/42] | Application number, filing date | 21839009.4 | 08.12.2021 | [2023/42] | WO2021EP84717 | Priority number, date | DE202010132966 | 10.12.2020 Original published format: DE102020132966 | DE202110110697 | 27.04.2021 Original published format: DE102021110697 | [2023/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2022122792 | Date: | 16.06.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/24] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4259555 | Date: | 18.10.2023 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.06.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B65G17/34 | [2023/42] | CPC: |
B65G17/345 (EP,KR,US);
B65G47/52 (KR);
B65G2201/02 (KR);
B65G2811/0657 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/42] | Title | German: | AUSSCHLEUSVORRICHTUNG | [2023/42] | English: | DISCHARGE DEVICE | [2023/42] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ÉJECTION | [2023/42] | Entry into regional phase | 03.07.2023 | National basic fee paid | 03.07.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.07.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.07.2023 | Examination requested [2023/42] | 03.07.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US3231068 (HARRISON WALTER G, et al) [Y] 8 * figure 3 *; | [Y]JPS6393326U (TOYO KANETSU STOCK ASSOCIATION COMPANY) [Y] 8 * figure 4 *; | [X]EP1153860 (TECHNOWAVE LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2 * figures 1-3 *; | [A]US2014014468 (PILARZ NOLAN R [US], et al) [A] 22* figure 1 *; | [XYI]US2015360869 (BASTIAN II WILLIAM A [US], et al) [X] 1-7,15,20,21,23-25 * paragraphs [0065] , [0075] , [0080]; figures 1,8,9,10, 20,23 * [Y] 8 [I] 22 | by applicant | DE19801706 | WO2020025329 |